BRIDGES et al v. ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: DEMETRIA BRIDGES, GREG GREGORIAN, CYNTHIA JESSE, ALVARO RODRIGUEZ, THOMAS TAYLOR, THELMA WATSON, TAJ WHITE, All Others Similarly Situated and LEONA BRIDGE
Defendant: ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC, ALIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC, RAVINDRA DEO, DANA K. BILYEU, STACIE OLIVARES and MIKE GERBER
Case Number: 1:2023cv01568
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph G. Sauder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10225902. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMETRIA BRIDGES, GREG GREGORIAN, CYNTHIA JESSE, ALVARO RODRIGUEZ, THOMAS TAYLOR, THELMA WATSON, TAJ WHITE. (Ulwick, James)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joseph G. Sauder is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/24/2023. (lcrdm3)
July 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Jackson on behalf of ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC (Jackson, James)
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Sweeney on behalf of ALIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC (Sweeney, Erin)
June 30, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ALIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Jonathan)
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Rose on behalf of ALIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC (Rose, Jonathan)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Alight Solutions LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Alight shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/30/2023. (lcrdm3)
June 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Timothy Raimer on behalf of ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC (Raimer, David)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Lejnieks on behalf of ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC (Lejnieks, Kristen)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eaton, Miguel)
June 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Francisco Eaton on behalf of ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC (Eaton, Miguel)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Accenture Federal Services, LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Accenture Federal Services shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/28/2023. (lcrdm3)
June 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/2/2023. (lcrdm3)
June 2, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GREG GREGORIAN, CYNTHIA JESSE, ALVARO RODRIGUEZ, THOMAS TAYLOR, THELMA WATSON, TAJ WHITE re #1 Complaint,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Ulwick, James)
June 2, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to julwick@kg-law.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl, )
June 2, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsl)
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10109027) filed by THELMA WATSON, CYNTHIA JESSE, TAJ WHITE, GREG GREGORIAN, LEONA BRIDGE, All Others Similarly Situated, DEMETRIA BRIDGES, ALVARO RODRIGUEZ, THOMAS TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Accenture Federal Services, #3 Summons Alight Solutions, #4 Summons Ravindra Deo, #5 Summons Leona Bridge, #6 Summons Dana K. Bilyeu, #7 Summons Stacie Olivares, #8 Summons Mike Gerber)(Ulwick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIDGES et al v. ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIA BRIDGES
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG GREGORIAN
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA JESSE
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVARO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS TAYLOR
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THELMA WATSON
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAJ WHITE
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONA BRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Miguel Francisco Eaton
Represented By: David Timothy Raimer
Represented By: James Andrew Jackson
Represented By: Kristen Lejnieks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rose
Represented By: Erin M. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAVINDRA DEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA K. BILYEU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACIE OLIVARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?