TIMMER v. DAILY CALLER, INC.
Plaintiff: REED TIMMER
Defendant: DAILY CALLER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01657
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by DAILY CALLER, INC..(Bandlow, Lincoln)
June 30, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/4/2023. (ztg)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's #7 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint, and DIRECTING defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's #1 Complaint by August 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2023. (lcbah3)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by DAILY CALLER, INC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAILY CALLER, INC. served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023 (Sanders, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of REED TIMMER (Freeman, James)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 8, 2023. (lcbah3)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DAILY CALLER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Sanders, Craig)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAILY CALLER, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10125167) filed by Reed Timmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Video, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Video, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)
June 8, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zljn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIMMER v. DAILY CALLER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REED TIMMER
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAILY CALLER, INC.
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?