TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BECERRA
Plaintiff: TUSCON MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, CROUSE HOSPITAL, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, UT HEALTH TYLER, UT HEALTH ATHENS, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN, SOUTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE TOMBALL, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, LENOX HILL HOSPITAL, ATRIUM HEALTH CLEVELAND fka CLEVELAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL, CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE fka MERCY HOSPITAL, SOUTHSIDE HOSPITAL, TOMBALL REGIONAL HOSPITAL and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 1:2023cv01672
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss in Related Case by XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clendenen, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA (Clendenen, Michael)
August 2, 2023 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATRIUM HEALTH CLEVELAND fka CLEVELAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE fka MERCY HOSPITAL, CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE TOMBALL, LENOX HILL HOSPITAL, ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (Croutch, Barbara)
August 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Croutch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Croutch, Barbara)
July 25, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ATRIUM HEALTH CLEVELAND fka CLEVELAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE fka MERCY HOSPITAL, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE TOMBALL, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, LENOX HILL HOSPITAL, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, SOUTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, UT HEALTH TYLER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of I. Blumberg, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Declaration of I. Blumberg, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of I. Blumberg, #5 Exhibit Exhibits D and K to Declaration of I. Blumberg, #6 Declaration Declaration of E.K. Wolf and Exhibits E - J, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasseghi, Roya)
July 24, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, CROUSE HOSPITAL, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, UT HEALTH TYLER, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, LENOX HILL HOSPITAL, ATRIUM HEALTH CLEVELAND fka CLEVELAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN fka ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL, CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE fka MERCY HOSPITAL, SOUTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL fka SOUTHSIDE HOSPITAL, HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE TOMBALL fka TOMBALL REGIONAL HOSPITAL.(Vasseghi, Roya)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Keobopha Keopong is hereby permitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2023. (lcapm2)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ellen Kaufman Wolf is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2023. (lcapm2) Modified on 7/24/2023 (zjd).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Barbara Lynn Croutch is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2023. (lcapm2)
July 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA (Bryce, Peter)
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/22/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 6/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 12, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
June 12, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb)
June 9, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, UT HEALTH TYLER, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, UT HEALTH ATHENS, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO filed by MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, UT HEALTH TYLER, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, UT HEALTH ATHENS, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO.(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 9, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Keobopha Keopong, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10128258. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, UT HEALTH TYLER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ellen Kaufman Wolf, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10128247. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, UT HEALTH TYLER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara Lynn Croutch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10128223. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, UT HEALTH TYLER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasseghi, Roya)
June 9, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to roya@vasseghibuddlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, )
June 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-00840-APM. (Vasseghi, Roya)
June 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-00690-APM. (Vasseghi, Roya)
June 8, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, TUSCON MEDICAL CENTER, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, UT HEALTH ATHENS, UT HEALTH TYLER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL (Vasseghi, Roya)
June 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10127755) filed by MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, TUSCON MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO, TOURO LCMC HEALTH, HUNTINGTON HEALTH, GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST, UCHICAGO MEDICINE, MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY, UT HEALTH TYLER, HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL, HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA, BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS, UT HEALTH ATHENS, BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL, SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES, WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Vasseghi, Roya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUSCON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY HARBOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL SAN DIEGO
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER ESCONDIDO
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT JUDE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCRIPPS MERCY HOSPITAL CHULA VISTA
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTINGTON HEALTH
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE MISSION HOSPITAL MISSION VIEJO
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER POWAY
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER EAST
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAWAII MEDICAL CENTER WEST
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL CENTRALIA
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL MOUNT VERNON
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCHICAGO MEDICINE
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOURO LCMC HEALTH
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL SAINT CHARLES
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH DEPAUL HOSPITAL ST. LOUIS
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLINGS CLINIC HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HORTON CAMPUS
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAICA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIAGARA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARNET HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF BROOKLYN AT LONG ISLAND COLLEGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGSBROOK JEWISH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROUSE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH ALLIANCE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKDALE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH SAINT CHARLES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSM HEALTH SAINT ANTHONY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WVU MEDICINE UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLCREEK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UT HEALTH TYLER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UT HEALTH ATHENS
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCA HOUSTON HEALTHCARE TOMBALL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENOX HILL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM HEALTH CLEVELAND fka CLEVELAND MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATRIUM HEALTH PINEVILLE fka MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMBALL REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Represented By: Roya Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Barbara Croutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Represented By: Michael Patrick Clendenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?