CHAVERS v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: ESQ. CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR. and CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR.
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2023cv01840
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Haiber on behalf of HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Haiber, Scott)
August 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Mistretta Upton on behalf of CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR (Upton, Lauren)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/7/2023. (lcrjl2)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan C. Quinn on behalf of HOWARD UNIVERSITY (Quinn, Brendan)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendant's #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Responsive Pleading, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendant shall have through and including August 28, 2023, to file its responsive pleading. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/17/2023. (lcrjl2)
July 17, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive pleadings due by 8/28/2023. (smc)
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading by HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nagendra, Nathiya)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR served on 7/6/2023, answer due 7/27/2023 (Hjortsberg, Matthew)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Glikin on behalf of CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR (Glikin, Joshua)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Joshua Aaron Glikin be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/27/2023. (lcrjl2)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Aaron Glikin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10164322. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joshua Glikin, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hjortsberg, Matthew)
June 26, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to HOWARD UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
June 26, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to hjortsberg@bowie-jensen.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Filing fee not paid. Please remit payment using the event Payment of Fee-Complaint., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, )
June 26, 2023 Payment for #1 Complaint,. ($402; Receipt number ADCDC-10163782). (Hjortsberg, Matthew)
June 26, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zcb)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOWARD UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copyright Registration No. TX0008981687, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Registration No. TX0008981860)(Hjortsberg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAVERS v. HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESQ. CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR.
Represented By: Matthew Gilson Hjortsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYBORNE E. CHAVERS, SR.
Represented By: Joshua Glikin
Represented By: Lauren Mistretta Upton
Represented By: Matthew Gilson Hjortsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Scott R. Haiber
Represented By: Brendan C. Quinn
Represented By: Nathiya Nagendra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?