STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC and STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv01899
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Jia M Cobb
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct #6 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See document for amended order. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 15, 2023. (lcjmc3)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Order on Motion for Discovery Re-Issue Subpoena to Correct ISP Response Team by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re #7 Amended Motion for Discovery: The Court DENIES the Motion without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c). Should Plaintiff wish to refile the Motion, the Court directs Plaintiff to that rule, which states that "[e]ach motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on August 14, 2023. (lcjmc3)
July 31, 2023 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Discovery Correct the ISP Named in The Order Granting Early Discovery by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline) Modified event title on 8/1/2023 (znmw).
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on July 26, 2023. (lcjmc3)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Williamson, #2 Affidavit Declaration Stalzer, #3 Affidavit Declaration Paige, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
July 3, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsl)
June 29, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed)(James, Jacqueline)
June 29, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
June 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10174039) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?