STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC and STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.
Defendant: Joe Doe and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2023cv01900
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 07/28/2023. (lcss)
July 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
June 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrtw)
June 29, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed)(James, Jacqueline)
June 29, 2023 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
June 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10174047) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- a single transaction of each work infringed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?