HARRINGTON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: PHILLIP M HARRINGTON
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02456
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Receipt on 9/13/2023 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:23-cv-07062 sent by USDC for the Southern District of Indiana. (ztth)
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Indiana pursuant to #5 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
September 13, 2023 Filing 6 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-264), dated 9/13/2023, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard L. Young for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2570) (ztnr)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COOK GROUP INCORPORATED served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; COOK INCORPORATED served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023; COOK MEDICAL, LLC served on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned as to private individual or business, #2 Summons Returned as to private individual or business, #3 Summons Returned as to private individual or business)(Gallant, Michael)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
August 24, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PHILLIP M HARRINGTON.
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10299233) filed by PHILLIP M HARRINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Summons as to Cook Group Incorporated, #5 Summons as to Cook Medical, LLC)(Gallant, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRINGTON v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP M HARRINGTON
Represented By: Michael E. Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?