FRECH v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: Ivana Frech
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Not Classified By Court: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA, H. Katrina Brisbon, OFFICE OF RESEARCH INTEGRITY, Sheila Garrity and UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2023cv02530
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to SHEILA GARRITY. (Nichols, Jackson)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Stephen D. Tobin. While the Court will permit Mr. Tobin to appear pro hac vice in this case, the local civil rules provide that "as a general matter, attorneys who engage in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia and who file papers in this Court should be a member of the Bar of this Court and the District of Columbia Bar." See LCvR 83.2(c)(2) (comment). The Court therefore encourages counsel to submit an application to this Court's bar if he intends to litigate further cases in this court. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/7/2023. (lccrc1)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Paul E. Simon. While the Court will permit Mr. Simon to appear pro hac vice in this case, the local civil rules provide that "as a general matter, attorneys who engage in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia and who file papers in this Court should be a member of the Bar of this Court and the District of Columbia Bar." See LCvR 83.2(c)(2) (comment). The Court therefore encourages counsel to submit an application to this Court's bar if he intends to litigate further cases in this court. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/7/2023. (lccrc1)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, H. KATRINA BRISBON, SHEILA GARRITY, OFFICE OF RESEARCH INTEGRITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/20/2023 to add missing summons) (zcb).
September 6, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by IVANA FRECH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2, #4 Summons 3, #5 Summons 4, #6 Summons 5, #7 Summons 6)(Nichols, Jackson)
September 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to File Complaint and TRO Motion Under Seal is DENIED; and (2) If Plaintiff seeks to proceed, she must file the Complaint and TRO Motion on the public docket. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/31/2023. (lcjeb4)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION for TRO UNDER SEAL filed by IVANA FRECH. (See Docket Entry #2 to view document) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Modified on 9/6/2023 assigning entry number (zcb).
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul E. Simon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10312941. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Ivana Frech. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nichols, Jackson)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen D. Tobin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10312934. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Ivana Frech. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nichols, Jackson)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL filed by Ivana Frech. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Motion for TRO to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Proposed TRO Order to File Under Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal)(Nichols, Jackson)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 SEE DOCKET ENTRY #7 FOR OPERATIVE COMPLAINT.....COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA, H. Katrina Brisbon, Sheila Garrity, OFFICE OF RESEARCH INTEGRITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10312920) filed by Ivana Frech. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Nichols, Jackson) Modified on 9/6/2023 to reflect docket update (zcb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRECH v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivana Frech
Represented By: Jackson S. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: H. Katrina Brisbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: OFFICE OF RESEARCH INTEGRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sheila Garrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Bradley Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?