SCAN HEALTH PLAN v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: SCAN HEALTH PLAN
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA and CHIQUITA BROOKS-LASURE
Case Number: 1:2023cv03910
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by SCAN HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of All Defendants (Dreier, Douglas)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SCAN HEALTH PLAN. Attorney Imad Sayed Matini terminated. (Matini, Imad)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SCAN HEALTH PLAN. Attorney Paul Anthony Werner, III terminated. (Werner, Paul)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 1/8/2024; DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/8/2024 (Prins, Andrew)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/09/2024. (Prins, Andrew)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/9/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/9/2024. (Prins, Andrew)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas L Schlossman on behalf of SCAN HEALTH PLAN (Schlossman, Nicholas)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Prins on behalf of SCAN HEALTH PLAN (Prins, Andrew)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Meron on behalf of SCAN HEALTH PLAN (Meron, Daniel)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 1/8/2024 (Werner, Paul)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 11, 2024. (lccjn1)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHIQUITA BROOKS-LASURE served on 1/5/2024 (Werner, Paul)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, CHIQUITA BROOKS-LASURE, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(mg)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SCAN HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Werner, Paul)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #4 Request for Summons to Issue. The following error(s) need correction: Other- When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply one summons for the U.S. Attorney & one summons for the U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. Please refile. (mg)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SCAN HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons for X. Becerra (U.S. Attorney), #2 Summons for X. Becerra (U.S. Attorney General), #3 Summons for C. Brooks-LaSure (U.S. Attorney), #4 Summons for C. Brooks-LaSure (U.S. Attorney General), #5 Summons to CMS (U.S. Attorney), #6 Summons to CMS (U.S. Attorney General), #7 Summons to HHS (U.S. Attorney), #8 Summons to HHS (U.S. Attorney General))(Werner, Paul) Modified on 1/3/2024 (mg).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Imad Sayed Matini on behalf of SCAN HEALTH PLAN (Matini, Imad)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to pwerner@sheppardmullin.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (cb, )
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SCAN HEALTH PLAN (Werner, Paul)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10587406) filed by SCAN HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #6 Summons to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, #7 Summons to Xavier Becerra, as Secretary of U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #8 Summons to Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, as Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services)(Werner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCAN HEALTH PLAN v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCAN HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Paul Anthony Werner, III
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Represented By: Imad Sayed Matini
Represented By: Andrew D. Prins
Represented By: Nicholas L Schlossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Douglas C. Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Douglas C. Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Douglas C. Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIQUITA BROOKS-LASURE
Represented By: Douglas C. Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?