RUBIO v. MARTIN O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: IRMA RUBIO
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv00048
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for Full Case Management. (zcb)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for full case management up to but excluding trial. Any future filings related to this matter shall include the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/29/2024. (hmc)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/24/2024. (lctnm3)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Elliott on behalf of MARTIN O'MALLEY (Elliott, Scott)
January 24, 2024 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MARTIN O'MALLEY Electronic notice has been provided to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney's Office pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405g.Answer due by 3/27/2024, (zsl)
January 24, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsl)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall assign this case randomly to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/22/2024. (psu1)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Mezey. (zcb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by IRMA RUBIO. (zcb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY filed by IRMA RUBIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zcb)
January 8, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/08/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUBIO v. MARTIN O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMA RUBIO
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Represented By: Scott Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?