NWOSU v. FRIEDRICH et al
Plaintiff: ADAEZE NWOSU
Defendant: DABNEY FRIEDRICH and ANA C. REYES
Case Number: 1:2024cv00987
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DABNEY FRIEDRICH served on 4/22/2024; ANA C. REYES served on 4/22/2024 (zdp)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DABNEY FRIEDRICH, ANA C. REYES. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zdp)
April 8, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Ana C. Reyes is no longer assigned to the case. (zsl)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 ERRATA by ADAEZE NWOSU re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachment: #1 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(zsl)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by ADAEZE NWOSU (zdp)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 207063) with Jury Demand filed by ADAEZE NWOSU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(zdp)
April 4, 2024 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DABNEY FRIEDRICH, ANA C. REYES (zdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NWOSU v. FRIEDRICH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAEZE NWOSU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DABNEY FRIEDRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANA C. REYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?