NDOROMO v. GARLAND
Plaintiff: AKUBE WUROMONI NDOROMO
Defendant: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Case Number: 1:2024cv01359
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Jia M Cobb
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Plaintiffs facts for Remand by AKUBE WUROMONI NDOROMO (zdp)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ERRATA by MERRICK B. GARLAND re #5 Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berhane, Fithawi)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by MERRICK B. GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berhane, Fithawi)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by AKUBE WUROMONI NDOROMO. (zdp)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmw)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MERRICK B. GARLAND. Case related to Case No. 23-3000. (Berhane, Fithawi)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2024-CAB-01736 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by MERRICK B. GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Berhane, Fithawi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NDOROMO v. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKUBE WUROMONI NDOROMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By: Fithawi Berhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?