HATHMAN v. HOLBROOK
Plaintiff: LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN
Defendant: MICHEAL HOLBROOK
Case Number: 1:2024cv01496
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2024 Receipt on 7/5/2024 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 2:24-cv-03649 sent by USDC for the Southern District of Ohio. (znmw)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Ohio pursuant to #4 Order Transferring Pro Se Case; Sent to Court via extraction. (znmw)
June 10, 2024 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application. Sent to LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN. (zsl)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the USDC for the Southern District of Ohio. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 6/19/2024.. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/30/2024. (znmw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement) (mg)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN. (mg)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mg)
May 20, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 5/20/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATHMAN v. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LADERAL A.C. HATHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEAL HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?