ELI LILLY AND COMPANY v. CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant: CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01781
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lomeo, James)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' #7 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Answer the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is August 30, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/18/2024. (lcrjl1) Modified to correct chambers error on 7/18/2024 (smc).
July 8, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024 (Lomeo, James)
June 20, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw)
June 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James John Lomeo on behalf of ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Lomeo, James)
June 20, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark.. (Lomeo, James)
June 20, 2024 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Lomeo, James)
June 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10972252) filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademark Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - Websites and Social Media, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lomeo, James)
June 20, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (znmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY v. CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITOL CONTOURS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By: James John Lomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?