MURDOCK v. SCHEFFEL et al
Plaintiff: ZANE MURDOCK
Defendant: DOWD SCHEFFEL and SAVILE INVESTMENTS PTY. LTD
Case Number: 1:2024cv01899
Filed: June 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ana C Reyes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's #7 Motion for E-Filing Privileges. Under Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2), such a motion by a pro se party must "describ[e] the party's access to the internet, confirm[] the capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis, and certify[] that [the party] either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." LCvR 5.4(b)(2). An exhibit attached to Plaintiff's Motion shows that Plaintiff was permitted to file electronically in another federal court. The exhibit also includes a certification that Plaintiff had internet access and the ability to e-file documents as of August 2023. But the Motion and exhibit do not describe Plaintiff's current access to the internet or confirm his current "capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis." Id. Those requirements are important because a "pro se party who obtains a CM/ECF password consents to electronic service of all documents, subsequent to the original complaint, that are filed by electronic means." Id. 5.4(b)(6). The party is then "responsible for monitoring [his] e-mail account[], and, upon receipt of notice of an electronic filing, for retrieving the noticed filing." Id. The Court thus needs to be sure that Plaintiff can reliably access electronic filings.The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiff's Motion without prejudice. Plaintiff is welcome to file a renewed motion that complies with Rule 5.4(b)(2). Any renewed motion does not need to be elaborate. It simply needs to address each of the Rule's requirements. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/9/2024. (lcar3)
August 5, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ZANE MURDOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zdp)
July 29, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by ZANE MURDOCK. (zdp)
July 26, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's #4 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. Under Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2), such a motion by a pro se party must "describ[e] the party's access to the internet, confirm[] the capacity to file documents and receive filings electronically on a regular basis, and certify[] that [the party] either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." Plaintiff's Motion does not satisfy these requirements, and the Court therefore DENIES it without prejudice. Plaintiff is welcome to file a renewed motion that complies with Rule 5.4(b)(2). Notwithstanding the denial of his Motion, the Court thanks Plaintiff for pointing out a typo on this District's website, which the Court has asked the Clerk to correct. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/26/2024. (lcar3)
July 22, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAVILE INVESTMENTS PTY. LTD served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024 (zdp)
July 22, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ZANE MURDOCK. (zdp)
July 22, 2024 Filing 3 NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by ZANE MURDOCK (zdp)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to comply with its Standing Order. See Standing Order for details. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/3/2024. (lcar3)
June 28, 2024 Summons (2) Issued as to All Defendants. (zdp)
June 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 207664) filed by ZANE MURDOCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(zdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURDOCK v. SCHEFFEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOWD SCHEFFEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVILE INVESTMENTS PTY. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZANE MURDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?