PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE v. PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE et al
Plaintiff: PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Defendant: PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE and RAO KAMRAN ALI
Case Number: 1:2024cv02727
Filed: September 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2024 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 10/24/24; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:10/24/24. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2025.(stl)
November 14, 2024 Filing 25 ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 11/13/24; Page Numbers: 1-28. Date of Issuance:11/14/2024. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2025.(stl) Modified on 11/15/2024; filed in wrong case (znmw).
November 13, 2024 Receipt on 11/13/2024 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:24-cv-02850 sent by USDC for the Northern District of Texas. (znmw)
November 12, 2024 Filing 24 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case; Sent to Court via extraction. (znmw)
November 1, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's notice, Dkt. #23 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas. It is further ORDERED that the expedited briefing schedule and status conference set for November 6, 2024, are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/1/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 30, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Defendants Agreement to Cease Use, Agreement to Stay, Non- Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue, and in the Alternative Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE re #14 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Transfer Case, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4-A, #6 Exhibit 4-B, #7 Exhibit 4-C, #8 Exhibit 4-D, #9 Exhibit 4-E, #10 Exhibit 4-F, #11 Exhibit 4-G, #12 Exhibit 4-H, #13 Exhibit 4-I, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 5-A, #16 Exhibit 5-B, #17 Exhibit 6, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Buffmire, Edwin)
October 24, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #20 Notice to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Jurisdictional Discovery Responses and Plaintiff's Requested Relief filed by RAO KAMRAN ALI, PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brooke, Thomas) Modified to add link on 10/25/2024 (znmw).
October 24, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/24/2024. For the reasons stated on the record Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Memorandum by 10/30/2024. Defendant shall file a response by 11/1/2024 and Plaintiff shall file a reply by 11/4/2024. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 11/6/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay) (zglw)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for partial virtual appearance, Dkt. #21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel may appear via Zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 23, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Partial Virtual Appearance re Order,, Set Hearings, by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buffmire, Edwin) Modified event on 10/24/2024 (znmw).
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's notice regarding Defendants' jurisdictional discovery responses and Plaintiff's requested relief, Dkt. #20 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on October 24, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8. If the parties wish to appear by Zoom, they may file a motion requesting that relief. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/23/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 22, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE Regarding Defendants Jurisdictional Discovery Responses and Plaintiffs Requested Relief by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Buffmire, Edwin)
October 17, 2024 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 10/15/24; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance:10/17/24. Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay, Telephone number 202-354-3053, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/7/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2025.(stl)
October 15, 2024 Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by RAO KAMRAN ALI, PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (See Docket Entry #14 to view document). (znmw)
October 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attempted Service Attempts and Actual Notice of Status Conference by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Buffmire, Edwin)
October 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin McAllister Buffmire on behalf of PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE (Buffmire, Edwin)
October 15, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Wenger on behalf of PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE (Wenger, Edward)
October 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss OR TRANSFER, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by RAO KAMRAN ALI, PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooke, Thomas). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 10/16/2024 (znmw).
October 15, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Willcox Brooke on behalf of All Defendants (Brooke, Thomas)
October 15, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Gierhart on behalf of All Defendants (Gierhart, Cynthia)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon further consideration of Defendants' request to conduct jurisdictional discovery, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants are authorized to serve written discovery requests limited to the questions of whether and, if so, how Plaintiff has suffered any cognizable injury in the District of Columbia. See Gather Workspaces LLC v. Gathering Spot, LLC, No. CV 19-2669 (RC), 2020 WL 6118439, at *9 (D.D.C. Oct. 16, 2020). The Court expresses no view on whether such an injury would be sufficient to support personal jurisdiction but, to ensure that the jurisdictional record is sufficiently developed to permit the Court to resolve the pending motion for a temporary restraining order, the Court will permit that limited discovery. It is further ORDERED that, if the parties would like the Court to refer the matter to a Magistrate Judge to assist in settlement discussions, the parties shall jointly contact the Deputy Clerk to convey that request, and the Court will promptly refer the matter for mediation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/15/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 15, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: For the reasons stated on the record, document requests can be served immediately. Response due before the deposition. The deposition should take place on or before October 22, 2024, further filing with respect to jurisdiction from the plaintiffs shall be filed on or before October 25, 2024, and any further opposition can be filed by the defendant, on or before October 30, 2024. A further hearing on the TRO is set for October 31, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Sherry Lindsay) (zglw)
October 11, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Uzma Rehman Ali, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B - Defendants trademark application, #7 Exhibit C - Declaration of Caren Luckie, #8 Exhibit C-1, #9 Exhibit C-2, #10 Exhibit D - N.D. Tex. Complaint, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordova, Laura)
October 11, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE served on 10/4/2024, answer due 10/25/2024 (Cordova, Laura)
October 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edwin Buffmire, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11228644. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration for Pro Hac Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordova, Laura)
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Arthur Gollwitzer III, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11228625. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration for Pro Hac Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordova, Laura)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Arthur Gollwitzer III is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/11/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. #11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on October 15, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall ensure that Defendants receive actual notice of this order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/11/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Edwin Buffmire is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/11/2024. (lcrdm3)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/3/2024. (lcrdm3)
September 30, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
September 30, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to RAO KAMRAN ALI, PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw)
September 27, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE ("PAK-PAC") re Notice of Error- New Case, filed by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE ("PAK-PAC"). Related document: Notice of Error- New Case,.(CORDOVA, LAURA)
September 27, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw)
September 27, 2024 NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet. The following error(s) need correction: Blank/Incomplete/Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE ("PAK-PAC") (CORDOVA, LAURA)
September 24, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA M.K. CORDOVA on behalf of PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE ("PAK-PAC") (CORDOVA, LAURA)
September 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11182940) filed by PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE ("PAK-PAC"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(CORDOVA, LAURA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE v. PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAKISTANI AMERICAN POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: Thomas Willcox Brooke
Represented By: Cynthia Gierhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAO KAMRAN ALI
Represented By: Thomas Willcox Brooke
Represented By: Cynthia Gierhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAKISTANI AMERICAN PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Represented By: LAURA M.K. CORDOVA
Represented By: Edwin McAllister Buffmire
Represented By: Edwin McAllister Buffmire
Represented By: Edward M. Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?