BANKS, et al v. USA

Plaintiff: JOHN H. BANKS, MARY BANKS and ELIZABETH S. ERRANT TRUST
Defendant: USA
Consolidated_plaintiff: EUGENE J. FRETT and EHRET MICHIGAN TRUST
Case Number: 1:1999cv04451
Filed: July 9, 1999
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
Presiding Judge: Emily C. Hewitt
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 548 UNREPORTED OPINION AND ORDER entering alternative merits findings and denying plaintiffs' request to reconsider 542 Scheduling Order Regarding Post-Remand Proceedings. As directed herein, on or before 9/1/2015, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether further proceedings are to be conducted by either joint stipulation or briefing. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (vl) Copy to parties.
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 REPORTED OPINION & ORDER denying 523 Plaintiffs' Post-Remand Motion for Entry by this Court of Rulings Consistent With and to Enforce the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals' January 28, 2014 Mandate. By separate order, the court will address further proceedings in light of this ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (vl) Copy to parties.
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 505 PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk of Court shall ENTER JUDGMENT for defendant DISMISSING plaintiffs' complaints in each case included in the case caption. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mm3) Copy to parties.
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER directing additional briefing on jurisdiction. Opening briefs due 9/7/11. Responsive briefs due 9/21/11. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mm3) Copy to parties.
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER denying 434 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mm3) Copy to parties.
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 OPINION AND ORDER Treating Plaintiffs' 290 Motion for Declaratory Judgment As Pre-Trial Motion and Granting Pre-Trial Motion To the Extent Set Out in This Opinion and Order and Otherwise Denying Pre-Trial Motion; Clarifying June 23, 2005 Opini on and Order As Requested by Plaintiffs in 290 Motion for Clarification; Setting Forth the Law Which Governs the Types of Damages Plaintiffs May Seek, Based Upon Plaintiffs' Brief filed May 7, 2009 309 and Defendant's Memorandum filed May 7, 2009 310 Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ae)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 PUBLISHED OPINION ( Status Report due by 10/29/2008) finding as moot 272 Motion to Strike. Treating 264 Plaintiffs' Damages Trial Memorandum as a Motion for Reconsideration and Permitting Introduction of Certain Additional Evidence. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKS, et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. BANKS
Represented By: John Broderick Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BANKS
Represented By: John Broderick Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH S. ERRANT TRUST
Represented By: John Broderick Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Terry M. Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: EUGENE J. FRETT
Represented By: Eugene J. Frett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: EHRET MICHIGAN TRUST
Represented By: Mark Englund Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?