NORTHROP GRUMMAN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: NORTHROP GRUMMAN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2007cv00613
Filed: August 20, 2007
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 OPINION (Redacted) re: 140 OPINION filed Under Seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief due by 10/1/2013. Subsequent briefing shall be in accordance with the deadlines set forth in the RCFC. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (redacted) re 111 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PUBLISHED OPINION (Redacted) re: 105 opinion filed under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Trial was scheduled to begin in this case on June 13, 2011. That trial is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER re:Motion to Dismiss: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 5/27/2011. Reply to plaintiff's response due by 6/2/2011 at 5:30 p.m.(EDT). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 65 Motion in Limine; granting 66 Motion in Limine for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: At the May 20, 2011, pre-trial conference, the parties should be prepared to provide the court with a revised witness list. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+; granting 84 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+; and granting 85 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 59 pretrial order: Pre-trial conference has been rescheduled for May 20, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. (EDT) at the United States Court of Federal Claims. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Amend Schedule. Defendant shall file its pre-trial contentions of fact and law, witness list, and exhibit list due by 4/22/11. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties shall have the Meeting of Counsel on or before 2/18/2011. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 3/7/2011. Exhibit List due by 3/7/2011. Witness List due by 3/7/2011. Response to Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/8/2011. Response to Exhibit List due by 4/8/2011. Response to Witness List due by 4/8/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/4/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall exchange expert reports by 10/15/2010. Expert discovery completed by 12/16/2010. Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Produce. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PUBLISHED OPINION(redacted) to opinion 43 filed under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for an Extension of time to file expert discovery. Proposed Expert Discovery Schedules due by 6/28/2010. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to amend the schedule for briefing of dispositive motions. Joint Stipulation of facts due on or before 5/26/2009. Plaintiff summary judgment motion due on or before 6/16/2009. Defendant response/cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 8/4/2009. Plaintiff reply/response due on or before 9/9/2009. Defendant reply due on or before 10/6/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend Discovery Schedule. All expert discovery deadlines are hereby terminated, to be reinstated at later date, if necessary. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to extend discovery.Fact discovery due by 1/9/09. Expert reports due by 1/30/09. Depositions of expert witnesses due by 3/20/09. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/09. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTHROP GRUMMAN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHROP GRUMMAN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: David C. Aisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Armando A. Rodriguez-Feo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?