WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC., WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK and SAVINGS OF AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2008cv00211
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Presiding Judge: Marian Blank Horn
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Amended Answer due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time.Answer or otherwise response to plaintiffs' second amended complaint due by 12/16/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery. The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to disclosure of expert testimony. On or 12/12/2013, the parties shall exchange expert reports; on or before 1/24/2014, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before 3/14/2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be completed. Status Report due by 3/28/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFact Discovery due by 11/14/2013. The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to disclosure of expert testimony. On or bef ore November 12, 2013, the parties shall exchange expert reports; on or before December 16, 2013, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before February 14, 2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be completed. On Feb ruary 24, 2014, or two weeks after the completion of discovery, whichever occurs earlier, counsel are directed to FILE a Joint Status Report informing the court of the status of proceedings in this case and the extent to which the parties have determ ined whether any or all of the instant matter may be settled. The status report shall also set forth a proposed schedule for the exchanges required by Appendix A, 13 and the filings required by 14 through 17. In the event that any dispositive motions are to be filed, the status report shall state a proposed date for such motions. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties. Modified on 10/23/2013 - corrected text(jt1).
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFact Discovery due by 10/15/2013. The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to disclosure of expert testimony. On or bef ore 11/12/2013, the parties shall exchange expert reports; on or before 12/16/2013, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before 2/14/2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be completed. Status Report due by 2/24/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC.
Represented By: Maria O'Toole Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK
Represented By: Ellis Larry Reemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVINGS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Bruce Edward Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jennifer Dover Spriggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?