EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. USA

Plaintiff: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00165
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Loren A. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Docketed for Administrative Purposes: ORDER denying 106 Motion Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jwg) Copy to parties.
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORTED OPINION denying 90 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms) Copy to parties.
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PUBLISHED OPINION granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Copy to parties.
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 7 Motion for Transfer Back to the Clerk of Court for Random Reassignment Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (gs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By: William Stephen Foster, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kenneth David Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?