COLONIAL CHEVROLET CO., INC. et al v. USA
Plaintiff: |
COLONIAL CHEVROLET CO., INC. and MIKE FINNIN MOTORS, INC. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00647 |
Filed: |
September 27, 2010 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Emily C. Hewitt |
Nature of Suit: |
Taking - Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 12, 2025 |
Filing
652
REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Government's 643 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Kathryn C. Davis. (wsj) Service on parties made.
|
October 2, 2019 |
Filing
504
REPORTED OPINION The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the defendant regarding the claims of the representative plaintiffs pursuant to RCFC 54(b). Status Report due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lb) Service on parties made.
|
September 17, 2018 |
Filing
365
REPORTED ORDER denying 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 346 Motion to Supplement Evidentiary Record; The parties shall file any additional authorities they wish the court to consider regarding the plaintiffs' motion for class certification 66 by 10/1/2018.Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (js) Service on parties made.
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
263
UNREPORTED ORDER granting-in-part and denying-in-part 226 Plaintiffs' motion for relief; granting 260 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs' proposed discovery requests and schedule due by 6/30/2017. Defendant's response, if necessary, due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (ay) Copy to parties.
|
September 9, 2015 |
Filing
127
REPORTED OPINION denying 104 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (ay) Copy to parties.
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal; deferring ruling on 56 Motion to Consolidate Cases Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (sjv) Copy to parties.
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (sjv) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?