ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., v. USA

Plaintiff: ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.,
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00085
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Susan G. Braden
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPORTED Order The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPORTED OPINION granting 154 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPORTED ORDER denying 134 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (rgh) Copy to parties.
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REPORTED OPINION denying 112 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b); granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms) Copy to parties.
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 UNREPORTED ORDER Invalidity chart and non-infringement contentions due 2/1/2016. Status Conference set for 2/12/2016 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial on infringement set for 4/18/2016. Trial on damages set for 6/13/2016.. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms) Copy to parties.
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPORTED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Ruling on Indefiniteness Asserted Regarding Certain Claim Terms in United States Patent No. 6,874,729, United States Patent No. 7,097,137, United States Patent No. 8,167,242, United States Patent No. 8,517,306. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls) Copy to parties.
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PUBLISHED OPINION granting 31 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.,
Represented By: Craig S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?