GOODEAGLE et al v. USA

Plaintiff: THOMAS CHARLES BEAR, EDWINA FAYE BUSBY, GRACE M. GOODEAGLE, PHYLLIS ROMICK KERRICK, JEAN ANN LAMBERT, FLORENCE WHITECROW MATHEWS, ARDINA REVARD MOORE, TAMARA ANNE ROMICK PARKER and FRAN WOOD
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00431
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: George W. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 155 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ad) Copy to parties.
October 16, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION and ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Discovery Relief. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. [Entry re-docketed for Administrative Purposed Only] (ar) Copy to parties.
July 28, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION denying 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 94 Cross Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (jf) Copy to parties.
July 16, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (md) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOODEAGLE et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS CHARLES BEAR
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWINA FAYE BUSBY
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE M. GOODEAGLE
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ROMICK KERRICK
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN ANN LAMBERT
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENCE WHITECROW MATHEWS
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARDINA REVARD MOORE
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA ANNE ROMICK PARKER
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRAN WOOD
Represented By: Nancie Gail Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?