KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2015cv00156
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Nancy B. Firestone
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPORTED OPINION (PUBLISHED). Plaintiff's motion for judgment on administrative record GRANTED. Defendant's cross-motion DENIED. Agency's decision to reject plaintiff's proposal VACATED and REMANDED to agency until January 11, 2016 for further action consistent with this opinion. Defendant shall file status report by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties.
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPORTED ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and Fourth Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record -- Originally filed under seal on 9/22/2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties.
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 UNREPORTED OPINION originally filed under seal on March 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (sr) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Frances Jeanne Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Matthew Paul Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?