ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, INC., VALUE RECOVERY HOLDINGS LLC, CBE GROUP, INC., AUTOMATED COLLECTION SERVICES, INC., WINDHAM PROFESSIONALS, INC. and TEXAS GUARANTEED STUDENT LOAN CORP.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00493
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Susan G. Braden
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPORTED ORDER Status Report due by 9/14/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 UNREPORTED ORDER Status Report due by 8/4/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (cn) Copy to parties.
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 UNREPORTED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (rgh) Copy to parties.
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 UNREPORTED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 UNREPORTED ORDER on 47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (rgh) Copy to parties.
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 UNREPORTED ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS FOR THIRTY DAYS Status Report due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (rgh) Copy to parties.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan S. Aronie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: David Richard Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: William M. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: David Ronald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: VALUE RECOVERY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: James C. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: CBE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jeffery Mitchell Chiow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: AUTOMATED COLLECTION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: John Ryan Prairie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: WINDHAM PROFESSIONALS, INC.
Represented By: David Thomas Ralston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: TEXAS GUARANTEED STUDENT LOAN CORP.
Represented By: Thomas Parker McLish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?