IN RE ADDICKS AND BARKER (TEXAS) FLOOD-CONTROL RESERVOIRS V. USA

Plaintiff: IN RE: ADDICKS AND BARKER (TEXAS) FLOOD-CONTROL RESERVOIRS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2017mc03000
Filed: October 31, 2017
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Susan G. Braden
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (cn) Copy to parties.
December 8, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER denying 100 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (cn) Copy to parties.
November 20, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER REGARDING JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT AND SCHEDULING. Amended Complaints due 1/15/2018. Initial Disclosures due 1/30/2018. Answer due 2/28/2018. Discovery concludes no later than 5/31/2018. Dispositive Motion due 6/15/ 2018. Response due 7/16/2018. Reply due 7/31/2018. Oral Argument will be held on 10/29/2018 in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (cn) Copy to parties. Modified on 11/20/2017 to add deadlines (ar).
November 13, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER REQUIRING CASE IDENTIFICATION: Case Identification Notice due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (cn) Copy to parties. (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/13/2017 to correct typo in PDF) (ar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE ADDICKS AND BARKER (TEXAS) FLOOD-CONTROL RESERVOIRS V. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN RE: ADDICKS AND BARKER (TEXAS) FLOOD-CONTROL RESERVOIRS
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Bryant Steven Banes
Represented By: John Scott Black
Represented By: Edward Blizzard
Represented By: Riley L. Burnett, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Glenn Buzbee
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Ian P. Cloud
Represented By: Timothy Micah Dortch
Represented By: Phillip Bruce Dye, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin Armistead Easterby
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Allen Craig Eiland
Represented By: Luke Joseph Ellis
Represented By: Michael C. Falick
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: William Fred Hagans
Represented By: Charles W. Irvine
Represented By: Jason A. Itkin
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Johns
Represented By: Jack Edward McGehee
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Rand P. Nolen
Represented By: Eric Reed Nowak
Represented By: Derek Heath Potts
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Raizner
Represented By: Rene Michelle Sigman
Represented By: Minh-Tam Tammy Tran
Represented By: Vuk Vujasinovic
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jacqueline Camille Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?