BOYD et al v. USA
Plaintiff: JOHN BOYD, JR., KARA BOYD, LESTER BONNER and PRINCESS WILLIAMS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv01473
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Edward J Damich
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order CAFC Case Number 2023-2104 for #22 Notice of Appeal filed by PRINCESS WILLIAMS, LESTER BONNER. (ac7)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #22 Notice of Appeal. (ac7)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by LESTER BONNER, PRINCESS WILLIAMS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AUSFCC-8801066. Copy to CAFC. (Djordjevic, Nada)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing plaintiffs' complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Service on parties made.) (dls)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Substitute (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(c)(4). Added attorney Nada Djordjevic for LESTER BONNER, JOHN BOYD, JR, KARA BOYD, and PRINCESS WILLIAMS. Attorney John Frawley terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Nada Djordjevic in place of John J. Frawley , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Djordjevic, Nada)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNREPORTED OPINION granting #14 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Reply due by 5/19/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 19, 2023 to File Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by USA.Response due by 4/24/2023.(Edelschick, Douglas)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 4/21/2023. (Frawley, John)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by USA.Response due by 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Edelschick, Douglas)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. Response due by 3/10/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2023 to File Response as to #1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 2/27/2023.(Edelschick, Douglas)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response to Complaint due by 2/24/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (lp1) Service on parties made.
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 24, 2023 to File Response as to #1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 2/15/2023.(Edelschick, Douglas)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(c)(4). Added attorney John Frawley for LESTER BONNER, JOHN BOYD, JR, KARA BOYD, and PRINCESS WILLIAMS. Attorney Nada Djordjevic terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hem) Service on parties made.
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney John J. Frawley in place of Nada Djordjevic , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Frawley, John)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, signed by Clerk of Court(Answer due by 2/10/2023.) (py)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 10, 2023 to File Response as to #1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 12/20/2022.(Edelschick, Douglas)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Glenn Edelschick for USA . (Edelschick, Douglas)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Senior Judge Edward J. Damich. (hw1) Modified on 10/14/2022 to correct the assigned Judge's name in the docket text. (fm).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (AGR) (Filing fee $402, Receipt number AUSFCC-8236645) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by JOHN BOYD, JR, KARA BOYD, PRINCESS WILLIAMS, LESTER BONNER.Answer due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet John Boyd, Jr., #3 Civil Cover Sheet Kara Boyd, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Lester Bonner, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Princess Williams)(hw1)

Search for this case: BOYD et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BOYD, JR.
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA BOYD
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER BONNER
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCESS WILLIAMS
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Represented By: John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Douglas Glenn Edelschick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?