WINTERS v. USA
Plaintiff: TANYA WINTERS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2023cv00295
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
Presiding Judge: Ryan T Holte
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO #8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by TANYA WINTERS. Response due 5/15/23 Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/17/23.(tb)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER accepting deficient document received on 14 April 2023. The government's response due by 5/15/2023. The Clerk is directed to file plaintiff's deficient filing received 14 April 2023 by leave of Court as "Response to Show Cause Order." Signed by Judge Ryan T. Holte. (Attachments: #1 Deficiency Memorandum) (eir) Service on parties made. Plaintiff served via first class mail on 04.17.2023 (ac7).
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vijaya Surampudi for USA . (Surampudi, Vijaya)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNREPORTED SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Plaintiff's brief showing cause as to why this case should not be dismissed due by 4/4/2023. The government's response due within 30 days of date plaintiff files the brief. Signed by Judge Ryan T. Holte. (eir) Service on parties made. Plaintiff served via first class and certified mail 7018 2290 0000 5183 5913 on 03.07.2023 (cam). Modified on 3/7/2023 (cam). Modified on 3/27/2023 - Re-served at plaintiff's request to: P.O. Box 778, Tonto Basin, AZ 85553, via U.S. Certified Mail 7018 2290 0000 5183 9874 on 03.27.2023. (hw1).
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER No. 2022-01 dated 9/12/2022 continuing the suspension of paper filing requirements in pro se cases: Consistent with this court's General Orders issued on 3/18/2020, 11/13/2020, 12/23/2020, and 3/3/2021, it is ordered that judges, special masters, the Clerk of Court, and counsel of record for the United States may file electronically in pro se cases using the court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system. Pro se litigants shall, absent extraordinary circumstances, submit all case filings via e-mail to ProSe_case_filings@cfc.uscourts.gov. Pro se litigants may, if feasible, receive notification by e-mail of all electronic filings by filing an E-Notification Consent Form, attached to the General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (tb) Service on parties made. Plaintiff served via first class mail on 03.01.2023 (cam). Modified on 3/1/2023 (cam).
March 1, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Ryan T. Holte. (tb) Plaintiff served via first class mail on 03.01.2023 (cam). Modified on 3/1/2023 (cam).
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Non-ECF Case. (tb) Plaintiff served via first class mail on 03.01.2023 (cam). Modified on 3/1/2023 (cam).
February 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by TANYA WINTERS. Service: 2/21/23. Response due by 3/10/2023.(tb)
February 21, 2023 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by TANYA WINTERS. Answer due by 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibits), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Filed under seal per RCFC 5.2.(tb)

Search for this case: WINTERS v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA WINTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Vijaya Surampudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?