MAYES v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Petitioner: CLARENCE MAYES
Respondent: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2023vv00128
Filed: January 30, 2023
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Brian H Corcoran
Nature of Suit: Injury - Hemophilus Influenzae
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Completion Filed by CLARENCE MAYES (Rogers, David)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 PAR INITIAL ORDER: Affidavit due by 3/2/2023. Medical records due by 3/2/2023. Statement of Completion Due by 3/2/2023. PAR Medical History Questionnaire due by 3/2/2023. ( Signed by Chief Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. )(mpj) Service on parties made.
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (ypb)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing entry of appearance of Heather L. Pearlman as attorney of record for the Respondent. Signed by Chief Special Master Brian H. Corcoran. (ypb) Service on parties made.
January 31, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ypb)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 PAR Medical History Questionnaire, filed by CLARENCE MAYES. Service: 1/31/2023.(ypb)
January 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee $402, Receipt number AUSFCC-8476763) [Vaccination date: 12/3/2020], filed by CLARENCE MAYES.240 Day Notice due by 9/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #3 Petitioner's Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1 -Certificate of Birth, #5 Exhibit 2 - Vaccination Record, #6 Exhibit 3 - Dr. David Vann, #7 Exhibit 4 - Piedmont Atlanta Hospital, #8 Exhibit 5 - Piedmont Heart, #9 Exhibit 6 - Piedmont My Chart, #10 Exhibit 7 - Piedmont Physicians Neurology, #11 Exhibit 8 - Newnan Neurology EMG, #12 Exhibit 9 - Piedmont Newnan Hospital, #13 Exhibit 10 - Brian Gagne, #14 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of Petitioner)(ypb)

Search for this case: MAYES v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CLARENCE MAYES
Represented By: David Gregory Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Heather Lynn Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?