KELLETT et al v. USA
Plaintiff: ASHLEY KELLETT, JOSHUA GERMANY and ANNA GRACE GERMANY
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2024cv00455
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Zachary N Somers
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER re #9 Notice of Appeal filed by ASHLEY KELLETT, JOSHUA GERMANY, ANNA GRACE GERMANY. ORDERED that the appeal be, and it hereby is, DEACTIVATED. The appeal will be reactivated upon entry of the order disposing of the last such outstanding motion. (Attachments: #1 Memo)(ac7)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CAFC Case Number 2024-1712 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by ASHLEY KELLETT, JOSHUA GERMANY, ANNA GRACE GERMANY. (ac7)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #9 Notice of Appeal. (ac7)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by ANNA GRACE GERMANY, JOSHUA GERMANY, ASHLEY KELLETT. Copy to CAFC. (ac7)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re #7 Judgment, #6 Unreported Opinion,, filed by ANNA GRACE GERMANY, JOSHUA GERMANY, ASHLEY KELLETT. Service: 4/8/24. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(tb)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Service on plaintiffs made via USPS.) (ar)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNREPORTED OPINION DISMISSING CASE. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (mss) Service on parties made. Modified on 4/4/2024 to correct case caption. (ac7). Plaintiff served via First Class mail on 4/4/24. (tb).
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by ANNA GRACE GERMANY, JOSHUA GERMANY, ASHLEY KELLETT. Response due by 4/9/2024.(ac7)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **FILING FEE DUE.** Our records indicate that a filing fee has not been received. Plaintiff must submit either the required filing fee OR an application to proceed in forma pauperis, which can be located under the forms link at: #www.uscfc.uscourts.gov. Please contact the Clerk's Office at 202-357-6406 for any additional assistance. (ac7) Plaintiff served via first class mail on 3/26/2024. (sw)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Non-ECF Case. (ac7) Plaintiff served via first class mail on 3/26/2024. (sw)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Zachary N. Somers. (ac7) Plaintiff served via first class mail on 3/26/2024. (sw)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by ASHLEY KELLETT, ANNA GRACE GERMANY, JOSHUA GERMANY. Answer due by 5/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(ac7)

Search for this case: KELLETT et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY KELLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GERMANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA GRACE GERMANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?