MOVATE, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: MOVATE, INC. and SLASHSUPPORT INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2024cv01621
Filed: October 9, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Ryan T Holte
Nature of Suit: Tax - Income, Corporate
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2024 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this case , filed by USA.Response due by 12/20/2024.(Smith, Eric)
October 15, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Smith for USA . (Smith, Eric)
October 10, 2024 Filing 5 COVER SHEET by MOVATE, INC.. (Mezei, Saul)
October 10, 2024 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by MOVATE, INC.. (Mezei, Saul)
October 10, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Ryan T. Holte. (tb)
October 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tb)
October 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9909316) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by MOVATE, INC.. Answer due by 12/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit 1), #2 Exhibit (Exhibit 2), #3 Exhibit (Exhibit 3), #4 Exhibit (Exhibit 4))(tb)

Search for this case: MOVATE, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOVATE, INC.
Represented By: Saul Mezei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLASHSUPPORT INC.
Represented By: Saul Mezei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Eric J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?