BALL et al v. USA
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. BALL, III, GEORGIAANN G. BALL, JOHN P. CRISMAN, ROLAND L. CRISMAN AND MAYME CRISMAN LIFE ESTATE, PAMELA J. BASTEMEYER, BRUCE A. CRISMAN, JULIE A. WOLDEN, NAN E. VANOSDEL, JOHN C. FATHKE, JANICE C. FATHKE and KRCIL PROPERTY, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2024cv01761
Filed: October 28, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Stephen S Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Taking - Rails to Trails
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. Response due by 1/27/2025. Signed by Judge Stephen S. Schwartz. (cmc) Service on parties made.
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 27, 2025 to File Response as to #1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 1/3/2025.(Gette, James)
December 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James David Gette for USA .. (Gette, James)
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement for Krcil Property, LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Largent, Meghan)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff, Krcil Property, LLC, to file its Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by 12/4/2024. Signed by Judge Stephen S. Schwartz. (cmc) Service on parties made.
October 31, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Stephen S. Schwartz for all further proceedings. Judge Armando O. Bonilla no longer assigned to the case. (py)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING: Pursuant to the Rule 40.1(b) of the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims, and to promote the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned matter to the Honorable Stephen S. Schwartz. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
October 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (rp)
October 29, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (lb)
October 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9959253) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by All Plaintiffs. Answer due by 12/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lb)

Search for this case: BALL et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. BALL, III
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIAANN G. BALL
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN P. CRISMAN
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND L. CRISMAN AND MAYME CRISMAN LIFE ESTATE
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA J. BASTEMEYER
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE A. CRISMAN
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE A. WOLDEN
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAN E. VANOSDEL
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN C. FATHKE
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE C. FATHKE
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRCIL PROPERTY, LLC
Represented By: Meghan S. Largent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: James David Gette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?