DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01792
Filed: October 31, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Eleni M Roumel
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Filing 23 **SEALED**AMENDED DOCUMENT, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Amendment to #1 Complaint, . (Dixon, David)
November 27, 2024 Filing 22 **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD , filed by USA. (Soares, Antonia)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, for good cause shown. Defendant shall FILE the Administrative Record by November 27, 2024. Plaintiff shall FILE its Amended Complaint by December 20, 2024. The parties shall FILE their Opening MJARs by January 13, 2025 and their Closing MJARs by January 31, 2025. Oral Argument is set for February 20, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. EST at the United States Court of Federal Claims, Howard T. Markey National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties shall jointly submit to chambers two courtesy copies of pertinent documents from the Administrative Record by February 4, 2025. The courtesy copies shall be tabbed and shall include a table of contents. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on Parties Made
November 21, 2024 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil 11/27/2024 to File the Administrative Record , filed by USA.Response due by 12/5/2024.(Soares, Antonia)
November 19, 2024 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Hearing set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (tb)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER adopting modified proposed briefing schedule in #17 Notice. The parties shall adhere to the deadlines in this Scheduling Order. The parties shall confer and FILE public, redacted versions of all sealed pleadings within 14 days of filing. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 15, 2024 Filing 18 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. (Dixon, David)
November 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC. re Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set . (Dixon, David)
November 12, 2024 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Y. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. 11/12/2024 before Judge Eleni M. Roumel: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(ac7)
November 12, 2024 **REVISED** Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2024 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (tb)
November 8, 2024 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. (Dixon, David)
November 8, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Dixon, Toghrul Shukurlu, Aleksey Dabbs, Alexis Landrum, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 11/11/2024.(Dixon, David)
November 8, 2024 Remark: re: #15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Dixon, Toghrul Shukurlu, Aleksey Dabbs, Alexis Landrum filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Plaintiff's counsel included multiple Applications for Access to Protected Material in their filings which should have been filed separately. NOTE: The filing party shall not file a corrected document unless so ordered by the court. (aoc)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Veritas Management Group, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Intervene. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add Veritas Management Group, Inc. as an Intervenor-Defendant on the docket. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 7, 2024 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Tanner N. Slaughter, filed by VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..Response due by 11/11/2024.(Slaughter, Tanner)
November 7, 2024 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by John M. McAdams III, filed by VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..Response due by 11/11/2024.(Slaughter, Tanner)
November 7, 2024 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Gordon Griffin, filed by VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..Response due by 11/11/2024.(Slaughter, Tanner)
November 7, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..Response due by 11/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit VMG Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Slaughter, Tanner)
November 6, 2024 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2024 11:30 AM in 7th Floor Conference Room/VTC (Zoom) before Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (fm)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting Joint Status Conference for November 12, at 11:30 a.m. EST via Zoom. The parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report by 12:00 p.m. EST on November 8, 2024 including a joint proposed schedule for any anticipated briefing or proceedings and notice of whether Defendant intends to enter a voluntary stay and, if so, the proposed duration of the stay. The Court will separately provide the parties with Zoom information for the conference. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 4, 2024 Filing 8 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Dixon, David)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Seal Complaint and #3 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to FILE a public version of its #1 Complaint by November 8, 2024. The Court will file the standard protective order in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (jfr) Service on parties made.
November 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Ramos Soares for USA . (Soares, Antonia)
November 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ac7)
November 1, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (ac7)
October 31, 2024 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC. (ac7)
October 31, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Response due by 11/14/2024.(ac7)
October 31, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Response due by 11/14/2024.(ac7)
October 31, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (HHS) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9971611) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.. Answer due by 12/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac7)

Search for this case: DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: David Bailey Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Antonia Ramos Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: VERITAS MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Gordon Norfleet Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?