DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2024cv01802
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Edward H Meyers
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2024 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Corrected, filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Tolle, John)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Tolle, John)
November 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Direct Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.2(a) to Judge Edward H. Meyers. (py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [24-1504, 24-1505, 24-1508], filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Response due by 11/18/2024.(py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Response due by 11/18/2024.(py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (py)
November 4, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (HLS) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9975248) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Answer due by 1/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(py)
November 4, 2024 This case has been consolidated under case number 24-1504 pursuant to the order of 11/4/2024. ALL future filings shall be made in the lead case. (py)

Search for this case: DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: John R. Tolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?