RAYTHEON COMPANY v. USA
Plaintiff: RAYTHEON COMPANY
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv01824
Filed: November 6, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Armando O Bonilla
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting plaintiff's #46 motion for leave to file a reply brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to FILE by leave of the Court plaintiff's reply brief in further support of their cross-motion for leave to file an amended complaint (ECF 46-1). Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 46 **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Cross Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint , filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 1/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Reply In Support of Cross Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12 (b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.(Bezak, Reta)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting defendant's unopposed #43 motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall FILE their reply brief on or before December 27, 2024. The remaining deadline included in the Courts November 15, 2024 Order (ECF #17 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/27/2024 to File Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12 (b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.Response due by 1/2/2025.(Bezak, Reta)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Defendant-intervenor's request to voluntarily withdraw the three applications for access to protected material filed on December 4, 2024 (ECF 32-34) is GRANTED. The order filed by the Court on December 12, 2024 denying without prejudice defendant-intervenor's applications for access to protected material (ECF 40) is VACATED. The Clerk's Office is directed to VACATE the Court's December 12, 2024 order (ECF 40). Defendant-intervenor's three applications for access to protected material filed on December 4, 2024 (ECF 3234) are WITHDRAWN. The Clerk's Office is directed to WITHDRAW defendant-intervenor's three applications for access to protected material filed on December 4, 2024 (ECF 3234). Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12 (b)(1) and (6) and Cross Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Reply due by 12/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix Index, #2 Appendix Appendix, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Lowry, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/16/2024 to correct reply due date (sh).
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 **VACATED PURSUANT TO #42 ORDER of December 16, 2024**. ORDER denying without prejudice defendant-intervenor Northrop Grumman's #32 , #33 , and #34 applications for access to protected material filed on December 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made. Modified on 12/16/2024 (aoc).
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #33 Application for Access to Protected Material, #34 Application for Access to Protected Material, #32 Application for Access to Protected Material , filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.(Lowry, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #33 Application for Access to Protected Material, #34 Application for Access to Protected Material, #32 Application for Access to Protected Material , filed by USA.(Bezak, Reta)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #31 Motion to Dismiss - Rules 12(b)(1) and (6),, filed by USA. (Bezak, Reta)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF #35 ) is GRANTED. Counsel may respond to the December 4, 2024 applications for access to protected material filed by defendant-intervenor Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation (ECF 3234) on or before December 11, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to NOT TERMINATE the applications for access to protected material (ECF #32 #34 ) pending further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil 12/11/2024 to File Oppositions to Applications for Access Under the Protective Order , filed by USA.Response due by 12/20/2024.(Bezak, Reta)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 **WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #42 ORDER FILED ON 12/16/2024.** APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Tarsha Luke, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 12/6/2024.(Carey, Jason) Modified on 12/16/2024 (aoc).
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 **WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #42 ORDER FILED ON 12/16/2024.** APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Melissa A. Cox, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 12/6/2024.(Carey, Jason) Modified on 12/16/2024 (aoc).
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 **WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #42 ORDER FILED ON 12/16/2024.** APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Maureen F. Del Duca, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 12/6/2024.(Carey, Jason) Modified on 12/16/2024 (aoc).
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 **SEALED** MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12 (b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.Response due by 12/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Index to Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Bezak, Reta) Modified on 12/3/2024 response date pursuant to scheduling order. (py).
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting plaintiff's #28 unopposed motion for an extension of time. The parties are directed to FILE an agreed upon redacted version of plaintiff's complaint (ECF 1) on or before November 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil 11/25/2024 to Redacted Complaint , filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 12/6/2024.(Lowry, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Evan Matsuda, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/25/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION re #18 Protective Order and Access by Law Clerk. (Carey, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kristen A. Chapman, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/21/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Catherine K. Wettach, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/21/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jennifer K. Bentley, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/21/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by J. Hunter Bennett, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/21/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (ECF #9 - #12 , #19 - #20 ) applications for access to protected material. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Oral Argument set for 1/7/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (fm)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kayleigh M. Scalzo, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/18/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jason A. Carey, filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 11/18/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #17 Bid Protest Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BID PROTEST SCHEDULING ORDER: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation-Space Systems motion to intervene as a defendant-intervenor (ECF #15 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal (ECF #3 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to FILE under seal plaintiff's complaint (ECF #1 ). Plaintiff's proposed redacted complaint (filed under seal) (ECF #2 ) is STRICKEN. The Clerk's Office shall STRIKE plaintiff's proposed redacted complaint (filed under seal) (ECF 2). The parties are directed to FILE to an agreed upon redacted version of plaintiff's complaint (ECF 1) on or before November 22, 2024. Plaintiff's motion for a protective Order (ECF #4 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to REINSTATE plaintiff's applications for access to protected material (ECF #9 - #13 ). Defendant and defendant-intervenor shall FILE motions to dismiss on or before November 27, 2024. Plaintiff shall FILE a consolidated response to defendant and defendant-intervenor's motions to dismiss on or before December 13, 2024. Defendant and defendant-intervenor shall FILE their reply briefs on or before December 20, 2024. The Court hereby SCHEDULES oral argument (under seal) for January 7, 2025, at 10:00 A.M. (EST). The proceeding will be held at the Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC. Counsel shall notify Chambers of any requests to appear by Zoom on or before January 3, 2025. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Carey, Jason)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene , filed by NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Carey, Jason)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Yes. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, DC 11/15/2024 before Judge Armando O. Bonilla: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(tb)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court hereby SCHEDULES an initial status conference (under seal) in this bid protest for Friday, November 15, 2024, at 2:00 PM (EST). The proceeding will be held telephonically and counsel for each party will be provided with the dial-in information. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Bid Protest Status Conference set for 11/15/2024 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (tb)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to WITHDRAW plaintiff's applications for access to protected material (ECF #9 - #12 ). If and when a protective order issues, the requests for access to protected material will be reactivated by the Court. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Michael P. Ols, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 11/14/2024.(Lowry, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/13/2024 (sh). **Reinstated pursuant to order ECF #17 filed 11.15.24.** Modified on 11/19/2024 (vds).
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kelly E. Buroker, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 11/14/2024.(Lowry, Jeffrey)Modified on 11/13/2024 (sh). **Reinstated pursuant to order ECF #17 filed 11.15.24.** Modified on 11/19/2024 (vds).
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin P. Connelly, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 11/14/2024.(Lowry, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/13/2024 (sh). **Reinstated pursuant to order ECF #17 filed 11.15.24.**Modified on 11/19/2024 (vds).
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jeffrey M. Lowry, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY.Response due by 11/14/2024.(Lowry, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/13/2024 (sh). **Reinstated pursuant to order ECF #17 filed 11.15.24.** Modified on 11/19/2024 (vds).
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Reta Emma Bezak for USA . (Bezak, Reta)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (py)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (py)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. (py)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. Response due by 11/20/2024.(py)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **SEALED** MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. Response due by 11/20/2024. (py)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (py)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $405) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by RAYTHEON COMPANY. Answer due by 1/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(py)

Search for this case: RAYTHEON COMPANY v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYTHEON COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Reta Emma Bezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jason Andrew Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?