THE SUDDATH COMPANIES v. USA
Plaintiff: THE SUDDATH COMPANIES, TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC. and NATIONAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01836
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Zachary N Somers
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2024 Filing 37 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by NATIONAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC. of Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Bleicher, Noah)
December 23, 2024 Filing 36 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #35 Notice (Other),, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Bleicher, Noah)
December 19, 2024 Filing 35 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC. of Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Bleicher, Noah)
December 17, 2024 Portable Storage Disc/Drive or File Share Documents Received by the Clerk's Office (courtesy copy of the AR) (ac7)
December 16, 2024 Filing 34 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA of File-Sharing the Administrative Record and of Filing Contracting Officer Certification of Administrative Record and Administrative Record Index. (Tantum, Amanda)
December 13, 2024 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Ginsey Kramarczyk, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC..Response due by 12/16/2024.(Bleicher, Noah)
December 13, 2024 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jennifer Eve Retener, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC..Response due by 12/16/2024.(Bleicher, Noah)
December 13, 2024 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Moshe B. Broder, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC..Response due by 12/16/2024.(Bleicher, Noah)
December 13, 2024 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Noah B. Bleicher, filed by TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC..Response due by 12/16/2024.(Bleicher, Noah)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Amend Schedule. Administrative Record due by 12/16/2024. Plaintiffs' MJARs due by 1/15/2025. Cross MJARs and Defendants' Responses due by 2/12/2025. Plaintiffs' Responses and Replies due by 2/26/2025. Defendants' Replies due by 3/10/2025. Oral Argument set for 3/19/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Zachary N. Somers. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
December 13, 2024 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: #17 Scheduling Order,,, filed by USA.Response due by 12/27/2024.(Tantum, Amanda)
December 10, 2024 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Olivia C. Bellini, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES.Response due by 12/12/2024.(Chiow, Jeffery)
December 10, 2024 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Yongho Lee, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES.Response due by 12/12/2024.(Chiow, Jeffery)
December 10, 2024 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Cassidy Kim, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES.Response due by 12/12/2024.(Chiow, Jeffery)
December 10, 2024 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Shirin Afsous, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES.Response due by 12/12/2024.(Chiow, Jeffery)
December 10, 2024 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jeffery M. Chiow, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES.Response due by 12/12/2024.(Chiow, Jeffery)
November 26, 2024 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Dustin Vesey, filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC.Response due by 11/28/2024.(Holman, Craig)
November 22, 2024 Filing 21 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #2 Declaration, #1 Complaint,, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration, #2 Exhibits)(Chiow, Jeffery)
November 15, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Nicole Williamson, filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC.Response due by 11/18/2024.(Holman, Craig)
November 15, 2024 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Roee Talmor, filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC.Response due by 11/18/2024.(Holman, Craig)
November 15, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Craig A. Holman, filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC.Response due by 11/18/2024.(Holman, Craig)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 12/13/2024. Plaintiff's MJAR due by 1/13/2025. Government and Defendant-Intervenor's Cross MJARs and Responses due by 2/12/2025. Plaintiff's Response and Reply due by 2/26/2025. Government and Defendant-Intervenor's Replies due by 3/10/2025. Joint Appendix due by 3/14/2025. Oral Argument set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Zachary N. Somers. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Document #1 Complaint and #2 Declaration, granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
November 14, 2024 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Y. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. 11/14/2024 before Judge Zachary N. Somers: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(ac7)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
November 13, 2024 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC. (Holman, Craig)
November 13, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC.Response due by 11/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holman, Craig)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/14/2024 at 03:30 PM before Judge Zachary N. Somers. Signed by Judge Zachary N. Somers. (sja) Service on parties made.
November 13, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Tantum for USA . (Tantum, Amanda)
November 13, 2024 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Status Conference set for 11/14/2024 03:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Zachary N. Somers. (fm)
November 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Zachary N. Somers. (vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Service: 11/8/2024.(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document #2 Declaration, #1 Complaint, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Service: 11/8/2024. Response due by 11/22/2024.(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Service: 11/8/2024. Response due by 11/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Redaction of #2 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 11/8/2024.(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 3 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 11/8/2024.(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 **SEALED**DECLARATION by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Service: 11/8/2024.(vds)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9991026) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by THE SUDDATH COMPANIES. Answer due by 1/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(vds)

Search for this case: THE SUDDATH COMPANIES v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SUDDATH COMPANIES
Represented By: Jeffery M. Chiow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOTAL MILITARY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Noah Benjamin Bleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Noah Benjamin Bleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Amanda L. Tantum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: HOMESAFE ALLIANCE LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?