VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: ARMSTRONG ELEVATOR COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2024cv01882
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Carolyn N Lerner
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 28 **SEALED** AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Answer due by 1/27/2025. (Schoonover, Matthew)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15; granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 1/24/2025. Cross Motions due by 1/27/2025. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
January 10, 2025 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil January 27, 2025 to file cross-motions for judgment and motion for leave of the Court's standing order, filed by USA.Response due by 1/24/2025.(Phillips, Vincent)
January 10, 2025 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 #1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Reply due by 1/17/2025. (Phillips, Vincent)
January 3, 2025 Filing 24 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #23 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15,, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Schoonover, Matthew)
December 27, 2024 Filing 23 **SEALED** MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 #1 Complaint, , filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Response due by 1/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint Comparison)(Schoonover, Matthew)
December 26, 2024 Portable Storage Disc/Drive or File Share Documents Received by the Clerk's Office. (courtesy copy of the AR) (ac7)
December 23, 2024 Filing 22 **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Filing, Index, and Certification, filed by USA. (Phillips, Vincent)
December 17, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: #15 Scheduling Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 12/31/2024.(Phillips, Vincent)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend Schedule. Administrative Record due by 12/23/2024. Cross Motions due by 1/13/2025. Responses due by 1/24/2025. Replies due by 1/31/2025. Joint Appendix due by 2/5/2025. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
December 4, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by William Selinsky, filed by ARMSTRONG ELEVATOR COMPANY.Response due by 12/6/2024.(Perrone, Jonathan)
November 27, 2024 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Haley Sirokman, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Schoonover, Matthew)
November 27, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Timothy Laughlin, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Schoonover, Matthew)
November 27, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by John Mattox, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Schoonover, Matthew)
November 27, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Matthew Schoonover, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Schoonover, Matthew)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 12/18/2024. Cross Motions due by 1/8/2025. Responses due by 1/22/2025. Replies due by 1/29/2025. Joint Appendix due by 2/5/2025. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 25, 2024 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jonathan Perrone, filed by ARMSTRONG ELEVATOR COMPANY.Response due by 11/27/2024.(Perrone, Jonathan)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Document #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 25, 2024 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Y. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. (CMS) 11/25/2024 before Judge Carolyn N. Lerner: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(vds)
November 21, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent de Paul Phillips for USA . (Phillips, Vincent)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 18, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by ARMSTRONG ELEVATOR COMPANY.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Perrone, Jonathan)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Joint Preliminary Status Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 01:00 PM ET in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ce) Service on parties made.
November 18, 2024 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. Status Conference set for 11/25/2024 01:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (fm)
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ac7)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (ac7)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. (ac7)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. Response due by 12/2/2024.(ac7)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. Response due by 12/2/2024.(ac7)
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (SBA) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10004990) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. Answer due by 1/14/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac7)

Search for this case: VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VETERAN ELEVATED SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Vincent de Paul Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ARMSTRONG ELEVATOR COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?