GOLDEN IT, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: GOLDEN IT, LLC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: ACCELGOV, LLC, ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC and CCS LINTECH JV LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01893
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew H Solomson
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 35 **SEALED**First AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Answer due by 1/22/2025. (Levin, Jon)
January 8, 2025 Filing 34 **SEALED** MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Response due by 2/5/2025. (Levin, Jon)
December 11, 2024 Filing 33 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA Notice of Transmission of the Administrative Record and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certification of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Contracting Office, #2 Index of the Contents of the Administrative Record)(Shapiro, Rafael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Ken M. Kanzawa, filed by CCS LinTech JV LLC.Response due by 12/4/2024.(Lasky, Adam) **No Objections Filed** Modified on 12/4/2024 (vds).
November 27, 2024 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Erica L. Bakies, filed by CCS LinTech JV LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Lasky, Adam) **No Objections Filed** Modified on 12/4/2024 (vds).
November 27, 2024 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Adam K. Lasky, filed by CCS LinTech JV LLC.Response due by 12/2/2024.(Lasky, Adam) **No Objections Filed** Modified on 12/4/2024 (vds).
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is instructed to update the caption accordingly. All parties shall comply with the already-issued protective and scheduling orders. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (Solomson, Matthew) Service on parties made.
November 27, 2024 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by CCS LinTech JV LLC.Response due by 12/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lasky, Adam)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by December 11, 2024. Plaintiff Files its MJAR and Any Amended Complaint by January 8, 2025. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors File Cross-MJARs and Responses to Plaintiff's MJAR by January 29, 2025. Plaintiff Files Reply in Support of its MJAR and Response to Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-MJARs by February 12, 2025. Plaintiff's Initial Joint Appendix Designations are due by February 21, 2025. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors File Replies by February 26, 2025. Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenors' Joint Appendix Counter-Designations are due by February 28, 2025. Plaintiff's Additional Joint Appendix Designations are due by March 3, 2025. Defendant Files Joint Appendix by March 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 25, 2024 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. Status Conference set for 11/25/2024 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (fm)
November 25, 2024 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Yes. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Telephone Conference held in Washington, DC on 11/25/2024 before Judge Matthew H. Solomson. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via CMS Recording. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(si)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order **RE-DOCKETED TO CORRECT FILING ERROR WITH PRIOR ENTRY** STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 11/25/2024, at 11:00 AM Eastern. Counsel will receive instructions for joining via email. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (hw1) Service on parties made.
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for Monday, November 25, 2024, at 11:00 AM Eastern. Counsel will receive instructions for joining via email. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 21, 2024 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Virginia L. Gibson, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Response due by 11/25/2024.(Levin, Jon)
November 21, 2024 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Richard J. R. Raleigh, Jr., filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Response due by 11/25/2024.(Levin, Jon)
November 21, 2024 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Christopher L. Lockwood, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Response due by 11/25/2024.(Levin, Jon)
November 21, 2024 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jon D. Levin, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC.Response due by 11/25/2024.(Levin, Jon)
November 20, 2024 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Hunter M. Drake, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Holdon D. Guy, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Taylor R. Holt, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Michael R. Pillsbury, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Emily J. Chancey, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by W. Brad English, filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(English, Walter)
November 20, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Caitlin A. Crujido, filed by ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(Specht, Damien)
November 20, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by James A. Tucker, filed by ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(Specht, Damien)
November 20, 2024 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Damien C. Specht, filed by ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC.Response due by 11/22/2024.(Specht, Damien)
November 19, 2024 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC. (Specht, Damien)
November 19, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene , filed by ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC.Response due by 12/3/2024.(Specht, Damien)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 19, 2024 Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by ACCELGOV, LLC. (English, Walter)
November 19, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by ACCELGOV, LLC.Response due by 12/3/2024.(English, Walter)
November 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael Shapiro for USA . (Shapiro, Rafael)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #4 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #12 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (sl) Service on parties made.
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Service: 11/18/2024.(vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Service: 11/18/2024. Response due by 12/2/2024.(vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Service: 11/18/2024. Response due by 12/2/2024.(vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 11/18/2024.(vds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (EPA) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10007855) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by GOLDEN IT, LLC. Answer due by 1/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Certificate of Compliance)(vds)

Search for this case: GOLDEN IT, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLDEN IT, LLC
Represented By: Jon Davidson Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Rafael Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ACCELGOV, LLC
Represented By: Walter Brad English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ASRC Federal Cyber, LLC
Represented By: Damien Clemens Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CCS LINTECH JV LLC
Represented By: Adam Kamlot Lasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?