RGV REHAB CENTER LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: RGV REHAB CENTER LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2024cv01986
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Armando O Bonilla
Nature of Suit: Tax - Income, Corporate
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting defendant's #10 unopposed motion for an enlargement of time. Defendant shall FILE an answer or dispositive motion in response to plaintiff's complaint on or before March 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
January 29, 2025 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/5/2025 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2025.(Baney, Nathan)
January 29, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Baney for USA . (Baney, Nathan)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 motion for leave to file under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to FILE (Under Seal) by leave of the Court plaintiff's original (unredacted) complaint and appended exhibits (ECF 1 & ECF 1-2 to -21). The Clerk of Court is directed to FILE plaintiff's redacted complaint and appended exhibits (ECF 2 & ECF 2-1 to -20). Signed by Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (ead) Service on parties made.
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (py)
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Armando O. Bonilla. (py)
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by RGV REHAB CENTER LLC. (py)
December 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s), filed by RGV REHAB CENTER LLC. (py) Modified on 12/3/2024 - corrected docket text (jt1).
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,,, filed by RGV REHAB CENTER LLC. Response due by 12/17/2024.(py)
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by RGV REHAB CENTER LLC. Redaction of #1 Complaint,, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(py)
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10042119) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by RGV REHAB CENTER LLC. Answer due by 2/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(py)

Search for this case: RGV REHAB CENTER LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGV REHAB CENTER LLC
Represented By: Derek W. Kaczmarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Nathan Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?