THE LOGISTICS COMPANY v. USA
Plaintiff: THE LOGISTICS COMPANY
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: TECHNICA LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00063
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Marian Blank Horn
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend Pleadings. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
March 7, 2025 Filing 23 **SEALED**Unopposed MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 #1 Complaint, , filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 3/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Moore, Jackson)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
February 24, 2025 Portable Storage Disc/Drive or File Share Documents Received by the Clerk's Office. Courtesy Copy of the AR. (lb1)
February 20, 2025 Filing 21 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA . (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Certification, #2 Administrative Record Index, #3 Administrative Record 1, #4 Administrative Record 2, #5 Administrative Record 3, #6 Administrative Record 4, #7 Administrative Record 5, #8 Administrative Record 6, #9 Administrative Record 7, #10 Administrative Record 8, #11 Administrative Record 9, #12 Administrative Record 10, #13 Administrative Record 11, #14 Administrative Record 12, #15 Administrative Record 13)(Griffin, Sean)
February 14, 2025 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil 2/20/2025 to file Administrative Record , filed by USA.Response due by 2/28/2025.(Griffin, Sean)
February 14, 2025 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw #14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Erin O'Shea Haneman, #15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Lauren Haber, #13 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Christopher Foux , filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/28/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 14, 2025 Filing 18 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY. (Moore, Jackson)
February 13, 2025 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Amelia Serrat, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/18/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 13, 2025 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jackson Moore, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/18/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 13, 2025 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Lauren Haber, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/18/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 13, 2025 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Erin O'Shea Haneman, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/18/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 13, 2025 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Christopher Foux, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY.Response due by 2/18/2025.(Moore, Jackson)
February 9, 2025 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Case Nos. 25-126 with this case Case No. 25-63, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil February 14, 2025 to file Administrative Record (Response due by 2/24/2025.), filed by USA.(Griffin, Sean)
January 17, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Oral Argument set for 6/18/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (tb)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene. Administrative Record due by 2/10/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
January 16, 2025 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by TECHNICA LLC.Response due by 1/30/2025.(Jochum, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
January 16, 2025 Minute Entry - Proceeding held in Washington, DC on 1/16/2025 before Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn: Hearing. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (jm5)
January 15, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Kelly Griffin for USA . (Griffin, Sean)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Hearing set for 1/16/2025, 2:30 PM. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
January 15, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. Bid Protest Hearing set for 1/16/2025 02:30 PM in 6th Floor Conference Room/VTC (Zoom) before Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (fm)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lb)
January 14, 2025 Filing 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lb)
January 14, 2025 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY. Service: 1/14/2025.(lb)
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY. Service: 1/14/2025. Response due by 1/28/2025.(lb)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY. Service: 1/14/2025. Response due by 1/28/2025.(lb)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10133798) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by THE LOGISTICS COMPANY. Answer due by 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit 1), #2 (Exhibit 2), #3 (Exhibit 3), #4 (Exhibit 4), #5 (Exhibit 5), #6 (Exhibit 6))(lb)

Search for this case: THE LOGISTICS COMPANY v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LOGISTICS COMPANY
Represented By: Jackson Wyatt Moore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Sean Kelly Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: TECHNICA LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Newell Jochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?