ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. v. USA
Plaintiff: ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00071
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: David A Tapp
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Rust, Jayna)
February 21, 2025 Complaint dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4141(a)(1) this day. (aoc)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 33 UNREPORTED ORDER. Public version of ECF No. #26 reissued. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion to File Administrative Record via JEFS. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
February 13, 2025 Portable Storage Disc/Drive or File Share Documents Received by the Clerk's Office. Courtesy copy of the AR. (aoc)
February 12, 2025 Filing 31 **SEALED**RESPONSE to Order for Proposed Redactions, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redactions)(Pierce, Yariv)
February 12, 2025 Filing 30 **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA . (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index)(Pierce, Yariv)
February 12, 2025 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for File Sharing of Administrative Record , filed by USA.Response due by 2/26/2025.(Pierce, Yariv)
February 6, 2025 Filing 28 **SEALED**CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 29, 2025 before Judge David A. Tapp. Total No. of Pages: 1-52.To the parties in the case only: to order a copy of the transcript, click #HERE; and Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2025. (aoc)
February 6, 2025 Filing 27 Notice of Filing Certified Transcript for proceedings held on January 29, 2025 in Washington, D.C. (aoc)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 **SEALED** ORDER Denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; SCHEDULING ORDER: (Administrative Record due by 2/12/2025. Plaintiff's MJAR due by 2/26/2025. Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant's Response/Cross-MJARs due by 3/12/2025. Plaintiff's Reply/Response due by 3/20/2025. Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant's Reply due by 3/28/2025.); Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Copy to parties.
January 30, 2025 Filing 25 **SEALED**STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Pierce, Yariv)
January 29, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? y. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 1/29/2025. before Judge David A. Tapp: Hearing. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(jjg)
January 24, 2025 Filing 24 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Reply due by 1/31/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 24, 2025 Filing 23 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by USA.Reply due by 1/31/2025. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Declaration)(Pierce, Yariv)
January 22, 2025 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Katherine S. Nucci, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Rust, Jayna)
January 22, 2025 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Scott F. Lane, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Rust, Jayna)
January 22, 2025 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jayna Marie Rust, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Rust, Jayna)
January 22, 2025 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Emily Golchini (Unopposed), filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by William O'Reilly (Unopposed), filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Christian Curran (Unopposed), filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Robert Sneckenberg (Unopposed), filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Response due by 1/24/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: AR Filing Instructions. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document ; granting #4 Motion for Protective Order; granting #10 Motion to Intervene. Scheduling Order: Defendant's Response to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 1/24/2025 at 4:00 PM (ET); Oral Argument on set for 1/29/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 before Judge David A. Tapp. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
January 22, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. REPORTER PRESENT. Oral Argument set for 1/29/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4/VTC (Zoom) before Judge David A. Tapp. (fm)
January 22, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 1/22/2025 before Judge David A. Tapp: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(aoc)
January 17, 2025 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Affirming Statement in Pre-filing Notice, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC.. (Rust, Jayna)
January 17, 2025 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.. (Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 17, 2025 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC..Response due by 1/31/2025.(Sneckenberg, Robert)
January 17, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2025 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge David A. Tapp. (py)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/22/2025 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge David A. Tapp. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jjg) Service on parties made.
January 16, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Yariv S. Pierce for USA . (Pierce, Yariv)
January 16, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 7 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge David A. Tapp. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 6 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Redaction of #5 Attachments:# 1 **SEALED** Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/16/2025. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Service: 1/16/2025. Response due by 1/30/2025. (Attachments: #1 **SEALED** Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Service: 1/16/2025. Response due by 1/30/2025. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Service: 1/16/2025. Response due by 1/30/2025. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/16/2025. (aoc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10140254) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. Answer due by 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aoc) Modified on 1/23/2025 to seal Complaint, pursuant to Order #13 (aoc).

Search for this case: ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORION GOVERNMENT SERVICES, LLC.
Represented By: Jayna Marie Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Yariv S. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Sneckenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?