TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION v. USA
Plaintiff: TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00078
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew H Solomson
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 28 **SEALED**CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to #25 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, filed by BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC..Response due by 4/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pettit, Thomas)
March 13, 2025 Filing 27 **SEALED**RESPONSE to #25 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/20/2025.(Koenig, Tanya)
February 24, 2025 Filing 26 **SEALED**First AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. , filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Answer due by 3/10/2025. (Bleicher, Noah)
February 24, 2025 Filing 25 **SEALED** MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 3/13/2025. (Bleicher, Noah) Modified on 2/25/2025 to edit response date (vds).
February 24, 2025 Filing 24 **SEALED**Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint , filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 3/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Bid Protest Complaint (Redline))(Bleicher, Noah)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER: granting Plaintiff's unopposed #24 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
February 20, 2025 Filing 23 **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Filing Corrected AR, filed by USA. (Koenig, Tanya)
February 7, 2025 Filing 22 **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Filing, filed by USA. (Koenig, Tanya)
February 7, 2025 File Share Documents Received by the Clerk's Office - Administrative Record. (vds)
February 4, 2025 Filing 21 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (Bleicher, Noah)
February 4, 2025 Filing 20 **SEALED** REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (Bleicher, Noah) Modified on 2/5/2025 Possibly contains protected information. (hw1).
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by February 7, 2025. Plaintiff's MJAR due by February 24, 2025. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor's cross-MJAR and response due by March 13, 2025. Plaintiff's reply and response due March 24, 2025. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenor's reply due April 4, 2025. Joint Appendix due April 4, 2025. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
January 23, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Yes. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Telephone Status Conference held in Washington, DC on 1/23/2025 before Judge Matthew H. Solomson. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via CMS Recording. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(si)
January 22, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: PROCEEDING SEALED. Status Conference set for 1/23/2025 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (fm)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for Thursday, January 23, 2025, at 10:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Solomson. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
January 21, 2025 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Sierra A. Paskins, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 1/23/2025.(Bleicher, Noah)
January 21, 2025 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Aime J. Joo, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 1/23/2025.(Bleicher, Noah)
January 21, 2025 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Moshe B. Broder, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 1/23/2025.(Bleicher, Noah)
January 21, 2025 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Noah B. Bleicher, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 1/23/2025.(Bleicher, Noah)
January 21, 2025 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Nicole Williamson, filed by BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC..Response due by 1/23/2025.(Ittig, Kristen)
January 21, 2025 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas A. Pettit, filed by BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC..Response due by 1/23/2025.(Ittig, Kristen)
January 21, 2025 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kristen E. Ittig, filed by BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC..Response due by 1/23/2025.(Ittig, Kristen)
January 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (Solomson, Matthew) Service on parties made.
January 17, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene , filed by BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC..Response due by 1/31/2025. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Disclosure Statement)(Ittig, Kristen)
January 17, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Beth Koenig for USA . (Koenig, Tanya)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
January 17, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (vds)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER: granting #4 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Matthew H. Solomson. (ags) Service on parties made.
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 1/16/2025.(vds)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 1/16/2025. Response due by 1/30/2025.(vds)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 1/16/2025. Response due by 1/30/2025.(vds)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/16/2025.(vds)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (VA) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10141195) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Answer due by 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(vds)

Search for this case: TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TISTA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Represented By: Noah Benjamin Bleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Tanya Beth Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BOOZ ALLEN HAMILTON INC.
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Ittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?