BEAT-LDI JV LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: BEAT-LDI JV LLC, GENCETEK LLC, OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC, ASSYST, INC., NETWORK RUNNERS, INC., DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC. and RIGIL CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2025cv00082
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Thompson M Dietz
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 3/20/2025. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
March 6, 2025 Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Phillips, Vincent)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 3/6/2025. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDMENT TO ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. 25-82 has been designated the lead case in this matter. The following case(s) have been designated as member case(s): 25-295. The Clerk is directed to set MEMBER flag(s) in the member case(s). The Court GRANTS the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 3], in member case 25-295. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
February 20, 2025 Filing 37 JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Phillips, Vincent)
February 10, 2025 Filing 36 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kaitlyn E. Toth, filed by NETWORK RUNNERS, INC..Response due by 2/12/2025.(Barnett, Kevin)
February 10, 2025 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin N. Dorn, filed by NETWORK RUNNERS, INC..Response due by 2/12/2025.(Barnett, Kevin)
February 10, 2025 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Ariella M. Cassell, filed by NETWORK RUNNERS, INC..Response due by 2/12/2025.(Barnett, Kevin)
February 10, 2025 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin T. Barnett, filed by NETWORK RUNNERS, INC..Response due by 2/12/2025.(Barnett, Kevin)
February 10, 2025 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Dixon, Toghrul Shukurlu, Aleksey Dabbs, Alexis Landrum, filed by DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 2/12/2025.(Dixon, David)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDMENT TO ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. 25-82 has been designated the lead case in this matter. The following case(s) have been designated as member case(s): 25-213; 25-225. The Clerk is directed to set MEMBER flag(s) in the member case(s). The Court GRANTS the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 2], in member case 25-213.The Court GRANTS the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 2], in member case 25-225. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
February 6, 2025 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Phillips, Vincent)
February 4, 2025 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Mary Pat Buckenmeyer, filed by ASSYST, INC..Response due by 2/6/2025.(Bradel, Ryan)
February 4, 2025 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Brian S Yu, filed by ASSYST, INC..Response due by 2/6/2025.(Bradel, Ryan)
February 4, 2025 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Peter T Marx, filed by ASSYST, INC..Response due by 2/6/2025.(Bradel, Ryan)
February 4, 2025 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Ryan C Bradel, filed by ASSYST, INC..Response due by 2/6/2025.(Bradel, Ryan)
February 3, 2025 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Haley Sirokman, filed by OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC.Response due by 2/5/2025.(Schoonover, Matthew)
February 3, 2025 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Timothy Laughlin, filed by OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC.Response due by 2/5/2025.(Schoonover, Matthew)
February 3, 2025 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Ian Patterson, filed by OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC.Response due by 2/5/2025.(Schoonover, Matthew)
February 3, 2025 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Matthew Schoonover, filed by OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC.Response due by 2/5/2025.(Schoonover, Matthew)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDMENT TO ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. 25-82 has been designated the lead case in this matter. The following case(s) have been designated as member case(s): 25-152; 25-172. The Clerk is directed to set MEMBER flag(s) in the member case(s). The Court GRANTS the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 2], in member case 25-152. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 3], in member case 25-172. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 28, 2025 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Shane M. Hannon, filed by GENCETEK LLC.Response due by 1/30/2025.(Jochum, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2025 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Samarth Barot, filed by GENCETEK LLC.Response due by 1/30/2025.(Jochum, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2025 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Elizabeth N. Jochum, filed by GENCETEK LLC.Response due by 1/30/2025.(Jochum, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2025 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Katherine L. St. Romain, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC.Response due by 1/29/2025.(Ginsberg, Alexander)
January 27, 2025 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Michael J. Anstett, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC.Response due by 1/29/2025.(Ginsberg, Alexander)
January 27, 2025 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Robert C. Starling, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC.Response due by 1/29/2025.(Ginsberg, Alexander)
January 27, 2025 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Alexander B. Ginsberg, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC.Response due by 1/29/2025.(Ginsberg, Alexander)
January 27, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent de Paul Phillips for USA . (Phillips, Vincent)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 2/6/2025. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. 25-82 has been designated the lead case in this matter. The following case(s) have been designated as member case(s): 25-95. The Clerk is directed to set MEMBER flag(s) in the member case(s). The Court grants #3 Motion for Protective Order, and grants #2 Motion to Seal Document, in the lead case 25-82. The Court also grants the Motion to Seal Document [ECF 4], in member case 25-95. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 23, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington D.C. 1/23/2025 before Judge Thompson M. Dietz: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(ac)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Status Conference set for 1/23/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thompson M. Dietz. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 22, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: Status Conference set for 1/23/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (fm)
January 21, 2025 Remark: re: #8 Redacted Document filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Filing is missing the case number and Judge's name. NOTE: The filing party shall not file a corrected document unless so ordered by the court. (lb1)
January 21, 2025 Filing 8 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. (Ginsberg, Alexander)
January 17, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lb)
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Service: 1/17/2025.(lb)
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (lb) (rp).
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s), filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Service: 1/17/2025.(lb)
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Service: 1/17/2025. Response due by 1/31/2025.(lb)
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint,, filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Service: 1/17/2025. Response due by 1/31/2025.(lb)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10142966) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by BEAT-LDI JV LLC. Answer due by 3/18/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit (Exhibits A-F))(lb)

Search for this case: BEAT-LDI JV LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAT-LDI JV LLC
Represented By: Alexander Brewer Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENCETEK LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Newell Jochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OM PARTNERS JV 2, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSYST, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Bradel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETWORK RUNNERS, INC.
Represented By: Kevin Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVTECH SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: David Bailey Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIGIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Tenley Anne Carp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Vincent de Paul Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?