GENCETEK LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: GENCETEK LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2025cv00095
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Thompson M Dietz
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 This case has been consolidated under case number 25-82 pursuant to the order of 1/27/2025. ALL future filings shall be made in the lead case. (lb1)
January 27, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent de Paul Phillips for USA . (Phillips, Vincent)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This case is consolidated under the lead case, BEAT-LDI JV LLC v. United States, Case No. 25-82. The consolidation order issued on January 27, 2025, subjects the plaintiff to orders entered in BEAT-LDI JV LLC, and any amendments thereto. Accordingly, in the instant case, the Court GRANTS plaintiff's motion to seal #4 and FINDS AS MOOT plaintiff's motion for a protective order #4 . As a reminder, the parties are subject to the Protective Order that the Court entered in BEAT-LDI JV LLC, and any amendments thereto. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 27, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington D.C. 1/27/2025 through 1/27/2025 before Judge Thompson M. Dietz: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(ac)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Status Conference set for 1/27/2025 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thompson M. Dietz. Signed by Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (ac) Service on parties made.
January 23, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: Status Conference set for 1/27/2025 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thompson M. Dietz. (tb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thompson M. Dietz for all further proceedings. Judge Carolyn N. Lerner no longer assigned to the case. (lb1)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Dietz. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (lb) Service on parties made.
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (lb) Service on parties made.
January 17, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Carolyn N. Lerner. (vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 **SEALED**Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by GENCETEK LLC. Service: 1/17/2025.(vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 **SEALED** MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, MOTION for Protective Order, filed by GENCETEK LLC. Service: 1/17/2025. Response due by 1/31/2025. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by GENCETEK LLC. Applied Redactions of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/17/2025.(vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED HIGHLIGHTED DOCUMENT, filed by GENCETEK LLC. Redaction of #1 Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/17/2025.(vds)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-10143776) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by GENCETEK LLC. Answer due by 3/18/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(vds)

Search for this case: GENCETEK LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENCETEK LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Newell Jochum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Vincent de Paul Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?