SIMPLY LEGAL USA, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: SIMPLY LEGAL USA, LLC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor: KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE
Case Number: 1:2025cv00125
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Eric G Bruggink
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(b) and 12(b)(6), filed by USA.Response due by 3/26/2025.(Allenbaugh, Natalee)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Intervene Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jpk1) Service on parties made.
February 5, 2025 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? no. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, DC 2/4/2025 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE.(jpk1)
January 31, 2025 Scheduled Proceeding Hearing Set: Status Conference set for 2/4/2025 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (py)
January 27, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalee A. Allenbaugh for USA . (Allenbaugh, Natalee)
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene , filed by KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE.Response due by 2/7/2025.(Casimir, Dominique)
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Non-ECF Case. (vds)
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 DOCKETED IN ERROR **NOT MEMBER OF BAR.** Our records indicate that plaintiff's attorney is not admitted to the United States Court of Federal Claims Bar. To practice before this court and to obtain e-filing privileges in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system, you must be admitted to the court's bar. For information on attorney admissions and to obtain e-filing privileges, please visit the court's website at: #www.uscfc.uscourts.gov or call the Clerk's Office at (202) 357-6406. The attorney admission process should be completed by 2/24/2025. (vds) Modified on 1/22/2025 (vds).
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 DOCKETED IN ERROR NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds) Modified on 1/22/2025 (vds).
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (vds)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 Electronic Notification Consent Form. (vds)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (HHS) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number CFC2000XXXX) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by SIMPLY LEGAL USA, LLC. Answer due by 3/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Mailing Envelope)(vds)

Search for this case: SIMPLY LEGAL USA, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMPLY LEGAL USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Natalee A. Allenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Dominique Casimir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?