Kubit v. Google Groups and All Other Websites, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Nico Samara posted false and malicious statements that Plaintiff had HIV and that Defendant Google Inc. failed to remove such defamatory statements from Google Groups.

Plaintiff: Anna Kubit
Defendant: Google Groups and All Other Websites, Nico Samara and Kira Krumm Interior Design
Case Number: 2:2008cv00738
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying 13 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for court to provide explanantion by Anna Kubit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/20/2009. (DMB)
February 17, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for court to provide explanantion by Anna Kubit. (JS)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Dkt 11 Amended complaint filed by Anna Kubit is Stricken. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/4/2009. (MSS)
October 20, 2008 Filing 11 COMPLAINT AMENDMENT & Pleadings against Google Groups and All Other Websites filed by Anna Kubit.(JS) STRICKEN pursuant to order Doc. 12 Modified on 2/5/2009 (JS).
October 20, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 5 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anna Kubit. Related case(s): no. (JS)
October 20, 2008 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Interested persons order by Anna Kubit. (JS)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the complaint with prejudice. The clerk is directed to term any pending motions/deadlines and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/15/2008. (SKH)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 3 the Plaintiff Anna Kubit's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/15/2008. (LMH)
October 8, 2008 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/20/2008. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/8/2008. (LAG)
October 8, 2008 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/20/2008. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/8/2008. (LAG)
October 2, 2008 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 08/20/08. (kma)
September 29, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION to appoint counsel by Anna Kubit. (kma) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
September 29, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Anna Kubit. (kma) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
September 29, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google Groups and All Other Websites, Nico Samara, Kira Krumm Interior Design with Jury Demand filed by Anna Kubit. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit E)(kma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kubit v. Google Groups and All Other Websites, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Kubit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Groups and All Other Websites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nico Samara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kira Krumm Interior Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?