Citibank, N.A. v. Dalessio et al
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Defendant: Christopher Dalessio, Unknown Parties in Possession #1, Unknown Parties in Possess #2 and The Loan Corporation
Third Party Plaintiff: Christopher Dalessio
Third Party Defendant: The Loan Corporation and American Home Mortgage Servicing3, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Christopher Dalessio
Counter Defendant: The Loan Corporation and American Home Mortgage Servicing3, Inc.
Movant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2009cv00083
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff Citibank presented sufficient evidence at trial to establish the necessary elements of Count I, Mortgage Foreclosure. Defendant Dalessio did not present sufficient evidence to establish Affirmative Defenses for Failure to State a Cause of Action Based on Standing (No. 1), Non-Holder in Due Course (No. 5), Economic Waste and Unclean Hands (No. 7), and Truth in Lending Violations (No. 8). Defendant Dalessio did not present sufficient evidence to establish the neces sary elements of his counterclaim, Count I, Truth in Lending Rescission. The Court finds in favor of Citibank as to Count I, Mortgage Foreclosure. Under paragraph 7(E) of the note and paragraph 9 of the mortgage, Citibank is entitled to an award of its attorneys' fees and costs. The Court finds in favor of Citibank as to Count I of Defendant Dalessio's counterclaim. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of Dalessio's counterclaim. Plaintiff Citibank shall submit a Final Judgment of Foreclosure to the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 12/10/2010. (BGS)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 75 the Joint Motion to Cancel Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference scheduled for September 7, 2010 is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/7/2010. (LMH)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/26/2010. (LMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. Dalessio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dalessio
Represented By: Joseph Trunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties in Possession #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties in Possess #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Christopher Dalessio
Represented By: Joseph Trunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: The Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing3, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christopher Dalessio
Represented By: Joseph Trunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing3, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ira Scot Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?