Smith v. Arrow Financial Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela E. Smith
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services, LLC and The Law Offices of Erskine & Fleisher
Case Number: 2:2009cv00512
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 47 Motion by Defendant The Law Offices of Erskine & Fleisher for Sanctions and Order to Show Cause. Defendant shall inform the Court by next Tuesday, October 5, 2010 as to the date and time of Tiffany Smiths deposition. The depositi on shall take place on or before October 15, 2010. Tiffany Smiths request for an award of $2,500 in attorneys fees in her Response to Defendants Motion for Sanctions and Order to Show Cause (Doc. #54) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/1/2010. (LMH)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 44 Motion by Defendant The Law Offices of Erskine & Fleisher for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order Regarding Production of Handwritten Notes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/21/2010. (LMH)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Doc. #44 by September 17, 2010 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/14/2010. (LMH)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline for Limited Purpose and to Extend the Deadline for Dispositive Motions. The discovery deadline is extended to August 31, 2010 for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of Plaintiff's daughter. Pursuant to agreement of the Parties, dispositive motions are due September 10, 2010. All other deadlines remain unchanged. (2) Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiffs Handwritten Notes and Complete Answers to Deposition Questions 40 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall provide the notes to Defendant by August 31, 2010. Upon stipulation of the Parties, that portion of Defendants Motion to Compel concerning deposition questions that Plaintiff was asked regarding attorneys fees is DENIED without prejudice.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/17/2010. (LMH)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 The Plaintiff Pamela E. Smiths Motion for the Court to Appoint a Mediator. The Court hereby appoints Jeffrey J. Rice, Esq. of the law firm Goldstein, Buckley, Cechman, Rice and Purtz, PA., P.O. Box 2366, Fort Myers, Florida 33901-2366 as the Mediator in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/25/2010. (LMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Arrow Financial Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela E. Smith
Represented By: Scott David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Offices of Erskine & Fleisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?