Shaw v. United States of America
Petitioner: Vanessa Shaw
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00481
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Charlene E. Honeywell
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: Motion to Quash
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER adopting and approving Report and Recommendations re 22 Petitioner's Petition to Quash IRS Summons. Petition to Quash is denied. The clerk is directed to enter judgment for Respondent and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/1/2012. (SKH)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 20 MOTION for Hearing re 17 Response in opposition to motion filed by Vanessa Shaw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/7/2012. (LMH)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 10 Petitioner's Motion to Recuse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/9/2011. (LMH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vanessa Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas K. Vanaskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?