Lesti et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Robert E. Tardif, Jr., Franz Lesti and Petra Richter
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2011cv00695
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Presiding Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 OPINION AND ORDER granting 230 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant as to Counts VI, VII, and IX of the 24 Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff shall take nothing. The Clerk shall withhold the entr y of judgment pending the outcome of 219 Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion for Class Certification. Within 14 days, the parties shall submit supplemental memoranda addressing the impact of this Opinion and Order on Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion for Class Certification. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/13/2015. (MAW)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 OPINION AND ORDER overruling in part, sustaining in part, and recomitting in part 180 Appeal, Objection, and Motion to Partially Overturn Magistrate Judge's Order. The objection to the denial of the motion to compel is overruled; the objection to the failure to address fees and costs is sustained and the issue is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for consideration. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/28/2014. (RKR)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION AND ORDER overruling 170 Objection to and Motion to Overturn Magistrate Judge's Order, denying Alternative Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Named Plaintiff and Proposed Class Representative. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/4/2014. (RKR)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER denying 78 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/20/2013. (AAA)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION AND ORDER granting 35 SunTrust Bank's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 36 SunTrust Bank's Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 43 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice [ 54] Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Counts I, II, III, IV, and V of the 24 Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Counts VIII and X of the Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall comply with the 65 Order dated August 2, 2012. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/19/2013. (AAA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesti et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Elliot A. Hallak
Represented By: Amy S. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Tardif, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Robert F. Elgidely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franz Lesti
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Robbins
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra Richter
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?